EP3166644 - METHOD OF SYNTHESISING ADCS USING PHOTOCLEAVABLE LINKERS ON SOLID SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adc Biotechnology Ltd Optic Technium Ffordd William Morgan St. Asaph Business Park St. Asaph, Denbighshsire LL17 0JD / GB | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Charles Ian Robert ADC Biotechnology Ltd c/o Optic Technium Ffordd William Morgan St Asaph Business Park St Asaph Denbighshire LL17 0JD / GB | 02 /
JENKINS, Sara Louise Bryn Awel LLanelidan Ruthin Clwyd LL15 2RD / GB | 03 /
MCKEE, Colin Martin 88 St Andrews Road Colwyn Heights LL29 6DN / GB | 04 /
EVANS, David John 27 Becketts Lane Chester CH3 5RW / GB | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 15738433.0 | 08.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015GB51974 | Priority number, date | GB20140012134 | 08.07.2014 Original published format: GB 201412134 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016005744 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166644 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3166644 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, C07K1/13 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
A61K47/6889 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (GB);
A61K47/68 (EP,US);
A61K47/6855 (EP,US);
A61K47/69 (GB);
C07K1/13 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | A61K47/50, C07K1/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON ADCS MITHILFE LICHTSPALTBARER LINKER AUF EINEM FESTEN TRÄGER | [2017/20] | English: | METHOD OF SYNTHESISING ADCS USING PHOTOCLEAVABLE LINKERS ON SOLID SUPPORT | [2017/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DE CONJUGUÉS ANTICORPS-MÉDICAMENT (ADCS) À L'AIDE DE LIANTS PHOTOCLIVABLES SUR UN SUPPORT SOLIDE | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 30.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2015 | AL | 19.06.2019 | AT | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | IT | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | NL | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SE | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | IE | 08.07.2019 | LU | 08.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | FR | 19.08.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | GB | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | DE | 01.02.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 19.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GB | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 19.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GB | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 19.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GB | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 19.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GB | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 19.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 19.08.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2002168644 (AEBERSOLD RUDOLF H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-13,22,23 * figure 1 * [I] 5,6,14-21; | [XI]US2007212731 (HARAMURA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-13,22,23 * paragraph [0054]; figure 1; claim 12 * [I] 4-7,14-21; | [XI]WO2013185078 (SOMALOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7-13,22,23 * claims 1,28 *[I] 4-7,14-21; | [XI] - HAMMER R P ET AL, "PRACTICAL APPROACH TO SOLID-PHASE SYNTHESIS OF C-TERMINAL PEPTIDE AMIDES UNDER MILD CONDITIONS BASED ON A PHOTOLYSABLE ANCHORING LINKAGE1", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DK, (19900701), vol. 36, no. 1, ISSN 0367-8377, pages 31 - 45, XP000134273 [X] 1-3,7-13,22,23 * Scheme 2 * [I] 4-6,14-21 |