EP3183533 - TRACER COMPOSITION FOR TRACER AMMUNITION WHICH CAN BE FIRED FROM A GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEMEYER, Torsten Koppelweg 26 29229 Celle-Garssen / DE | 02 /
KRÜGER, Knut Wiecheler Weg 2 29320 Hermannsburg / DE | 03 /
BAUMANN, Christian Dorfstrasse 11 06528 Martinsrieth / DE | [2019/36] |
Former [2017/26] | 01 /
NIEMEYER, Torsten Koppelweg 26 29229 Celle-Garssen / DE | ||
02 /
KRÜGER, Knut Wiechelerweg 2 29320 Hermannsburg / DE | |||
03 /
BAUMANN, Christian Dorfstrasse 11 06528 Martinsrieth / DE | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15738939.6 | 21.07.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015EP66643 | Priority number, date | DE201410111852 | 19.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014111852 | [2017/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016026640 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3183533 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3183533 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/38, F42C19/04, F42C11/00, F42C15/40 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
F42B12/382 (EP);
F42C19/04 (EP);
F42C11/001 (EP);
F42C11/008 (EP);
F42C15/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTSPURSATZ FÜR AUS EINER ROHRWAFFE VERSCHIESSBARE LEUCHTSPURMUNITION | [2017/26] | English: | TRACER COMPOSITION FOR TRACER AMMUNITION WHICH CAN BE FIRED FROM A GUN | [2017/26] | French: | COMPOSITION TRAÇANTE POUR MUNITION TRAÇANTE POUVANT ÊTRE TIRÉE À PARTIR D'UNE ARME À FEU | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 30.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19187608.5 / EP3575735 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2015 | AL | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.07.2015 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | HR | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2004025211 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [I] 1,2,4,21 * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 20 * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 1 * * page 5, lines 3-19 * * figure 4 *; | [I]US2004099173 (RECTOR HARRY EUGENE [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,21 * paragraphs [0007] - [0018]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US2005034627 (MANOLE LEON R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,21 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0014] , [0015] , [0053] - [0065] - [0068]; figures 5-8,10 * [I] 3,7; | [A]DE10341713 (DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US7900619 (PALMER WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1,4-6 * column 1, lines 10-17 ** column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 67; figures 1-5 * |