EP3172554 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHEMILUMINESCENCE AND/OR FLUORESCENCE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/22] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHEMILUMINESCENCE AND/OR FLUORESCENCE MEASURING | ||
[2018/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technogenetics Holdings S.R.L. Via Monte Napoleone 29 20121 Milano / IT | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Chao Room 405 No. 190 W. Dalian Road Shanghai 200092 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Jianbo Sub-No. 63604 No. 24 South Part of Yihuang Road Wuhou District Chengdu, Sichuan / CN | 03 /
SU, Shenguang 6A Science and Technology Building Industrial Avenue Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 04 /
TANG, Qingwen No. 640 Houxiang Village Meizhou Town Xiuyu District Putian, Fujian / CN | 05 /
MELILLO, Luca Via degli Olmi 19/b 83047 Lioni (AV) / IT | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Borsano, Corrado, et al Metroconsult S.r.l. Foro Buonaparte, 51 20121 Milano / IT | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 15739293.7 | 21.07.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015EP66618 | Priority number, date | CN201410348068 | 21.07.2014 Original published format: CN201410348068 | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016012434 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3172554 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3172554 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/13, G01N21/76, // G01N21/11, G01N21/01, G01N35/10, G01N35/04 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
G01N21/13 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (US);
G01N21/645 (EP,US);
G01N21/76 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0187 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0475 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | G01N21/64, G01N35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR CHEMILUMINESZENZ- UND/ODER FLUORESZENZMESSUNG | [2017/22] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHEMILUMINESCENCE AND/OR FLUORESCENCE MEASUREMENT | [2018/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR MESURE DE CHIMIOLUMINESCENCE ET/OU DE FLUORESCENCE | [2017/22] |
Former [2017/22] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHEMILUMINESCENCE AND/OR FLUORESCENCE MEASURING | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 10.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2015 | AL | 19.09.2018 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5173741 (WAKATAKE KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1,10* col. 2, liens 36-68; col. 6, lines 36-48;; figures 1,4,8 *; | [A]US5223218 (FUKUOKA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 7, line 63 - column 10, line 40; figures 1,4 *; | [I]US2011256630 (CLINTON CHARLES M [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0026] , [0070] - [0072] - [0074] , [0077] - [0081] - [0092] - [0094] - [0097] , [0099]; figures 1,2,4,5,9-11,14,16 * |