EP3167291 - IDENTITY AND PURITY OF TISSUE BIOPSIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TETEC Tissue Engineering Technologies AG Aspenhaustrasse 18 72770 Reutlingen / DE | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENZ, Karin Hans-Seyff-Strasse 11 73037 Göppingen / DE | 02 /
FREUDIGMANN, Christian Julius-Kemmler-Str. 21 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
GAISSMAIER, Christoph Fliederweg 18 72127 Kusterdingen / DE | 04 /
HECKY, Jochen Auf der Kinzig 65 79112 Freiburg / DE | 05 /
MOLLENHAUER, Jürgen - verstorben / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2017/20] | 01 /
BENZ, Karin Hans-Seyff-Strasse 11 73037 Göppingen / DE | ||
02 /
FREUDIGMANN, Christian Julius-Kemmler-Str. 21 72770 Reutlingen / DE | |||
03 /
GAISSMAIER, Christoph Fliederweg 18 72127 Kusterdingen / DE | |||
04 /
HECKY, Jochen Auf der Kinzig 65 79112 Freiburg / DE | |||
05 /
MOLLENHAUER, Jürgen Bismarckstrasse 31 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15739536.9 | 10.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015EP65782 | Priority number, date | DE201410213571 | 11.07.2014 Original published format: DE102014213571 | [2017/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016005543 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167291 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3167291 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/6887 (EP,US);
C12N5/0655 (US);
C12Y304/24007 (EP,US);
G01N2333/78 (EP,US);
G01N2800/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTITÄT UND REINHEIT VON GEWEBEBIOPSATEN | [2017/20] | English: | IDENTITY AND PURITY OF TISSUE BIOPSIES | [2017/20] | French: | IDENTITÉ ET PURETÉ DE BIOPSIES TISSULAIRES | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 23.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2015 | AL | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 10.07.2015 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 10.07.2015 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO9414070 (SHRINERS HOSPITALS FOR CRIPPLE [US], et al) [I] 1-15* Beispiele 9-12; Ansprüche *; | [X] - DICKINSON SALLY C ET AL, "Quantitative outcome measures of cartilage repair in patients treated by tissue engineering", TISSUE ENGINEERING, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (20050101), vol. 11, no. 1-2, ISSN 1076-3279, pages 277 - 287, XP009186541 [X] 1-15 * Abstrakt; Material und Methoden, S. 280 Kol.2 letzter Absatz - p.285 erster Absatz; Figuren 2, 4-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.2005.11.277 | [X] - HOLLANDER ANTHONY P ET AL, "Quantitative analysis of repair tissue biopsies following chondrocyte implantation. + Discussions", NOVARTIS FOUNDATION SYMPOSIUM, WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, vol. 249, doi:10.1002/0470867973.CH16, ISSN 1528-2511, (20030101), pages 218 - 241, (20081007), XP009186540 [X] 1-15 * Abstrakt; p. 219 letzter Absatz - p.220, Material und Methoden, S.222 letzter Absatz - S.224 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0470867973.ch16 | [A] - DANIEL J KELLY ET AL, "Biochemical markers of the mechanical quality of engineered hyaline cartilage", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20070201), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10856-006-0689-2, ISSN 1573-4838, pages 273 - 281, XP019481252 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10856-006-0689-2 | by applicant | EP1824420 | - VON POOLE AR, "Immunochemical markers of joint inflammation, skeleton damage and repair: where are we now?", ANN RHEUM DIS., (199401), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 3 - 5 | - GARNERO P; PIPERNO M; GINEYTS E; CHRISTGAU S; DELMAS PD; VIGNON E, "Cross sectional evaluation of biochemical markers of bone, cartilage, and synovial tissue metabolism in patients with knee osteoarthritis: relations with disease activity and joint damage", ANN RHEUM DIS., (200106), vol. 60, no. 6, pages 619 - 26 | - HERRMANN M; SEIBEL MJ, "The amino- and carboxyterminal cross-linked telopeptides of collagen type , NTX-I and CTX-1'' (a comparative review", CLIN CHIM ACTA, (20080717), vol. 292, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cca.2008.03.020, pages 57 - 75, XP022699936 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cca.2008.03.020 | - GARNERO ET AL., "Association of Baseline Levels of Marker of Bone and Cartilage Degradation are associated with Longterm Progression of Joint Damage in Patients with Early Rheumatoid Arthritis: The Cobra Study", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2002), vol. 46, no. 11, pages 2847 - 56 | - GARNERO ET AL., "Uncoupling of type 11 collagen synthesis and degradation predicts progression of joint damage in patients with knee osteoarthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2002), vol. 46, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1002/art.10576, pages 2613 - 24, XP002978236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.10576 | - CHRISTGAU ET AL., "Collagen type 11 C-telopeptide fragments as an Index of cartilage degradation", BONE, (2001), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/S8756-3282(01)00504-X, pages 209 - 215, XP002425953 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S8756-3282(01)00504-X | - CLIN CHIM ACTA, (200811), vol. 397, no. 1-2, page 103 | - KÖHLER; MILSTEIN, "Continuous cultures of fused cells secreting antibody of predefined specificity", NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, no. 5517, pages 495 - 7, XP002024548 | - CAMPBELL, A. M., LABORATORY TECHNIQUES IN BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1986), vol. 13 | - ENGVALL, E., "Enzyme-Linked-Immunosorbent-Assay", METH ENZYMOL., (1981), page 70 |