EP3096916 - STEPPED DESIGN WELD JOINT PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electric Power Research Institute, Inc. 3420 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304-1338 / US | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEFERT, John Albert 13104 Serenity Street Huntersville, North Carolina 28078 / US | 02 /
PARKER, Jonathan David 19218 Betty Stough Road Cornelius, North Carolina 28031 / US | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 15739795.1 | 26.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015US12907 | Priority number, date | US201461931202P | 24.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461931202 P | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015112978 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096916 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/00, B23K9/032, B23K33/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
B23K9/02 (EP,US);
B23K9/232 (US);
B23K33/004 (EP,US);
F16B5/08 (US);
B23K2103/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHWEISSVERBINDUNG MIT GESTUFTEM DESIGN | [2016/48] | English: | STEPPED DESIGN WELD JOINT PREPARATION | [2016/48] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE JOINT SOUDÉ PRÉSENTANT UNE CONCEPTION ÉTAGÉE | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 04.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US1921242 (PRIEBE ARTHUR W) [X] 1,3,4,8 * page 1, line 51 - line 72; figures 1,2,5,6 * [A] 12-15[I] 2,5-11; | [XAI]US2415987 (BISSOUT HERBERT A, et al) [X] 1,3,4,8 * column 6 - column 14; figures 1a,2a,3a * [A] 12-15 [I] 2,5-11; | [XAI]JPS5765789U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,3,4,8 * figures 3(a), 3(b) * [A] 12-15 [I] 2,5-11; | [XAI]JPH0952183 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,3,4,8 * abstract * [A] 12-15 [I] 2,5-11 | International search | [Y]GB964743 (JOSEF BERTELS); | [A]US3506285 (COATES NICHOLAS F); | [Y]JPS56117899 (KOMAI IRON WORKS); | [Y]US2003038167 (KOMAI NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2004169062 (MARUYAMA HISANAO [JP], et al); | [A]US2009224530 (SESSIONS BEN DORRELL [US]); | [Y]US2011158572 (DAHLMAN PATRIK [SE], et al) |