EP3085081 - METHOD FOR SUB-PU MOTION INFORMATION INHERITANCE IN 3D VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HFI Innovation Inc. 3F.-7, No.5, Taiyuan 1st Street Zhubei City Hsinchu County / TW | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AN, Jicheng No. 44, Zhanlanguan Road XiCheng District Beijing 100037 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Kai A1101, Dongfang Yujinxiang Building No. 216 Tangli Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Jian-Liang No.133, Neipi Rd. Nanjian Vil. Su'ao Township Yilan County / TW | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 15739845.4 | 27.01.2015 | [2016/43] | WO2015CN71606 | Priority number, date | WO2014CN71576 | 27.01.2014 Original published format: PCT/CN2014/071576 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015110084 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085081 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/597, H04N19/436 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H04N19/597 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (KR,US);
H04N19/139 (KR,US);
H04N19/157 (KR);
H04N19/176 (KR,US);
H04N19/436 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/52 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | H04N13/00, H04N19/513 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERERBUNG VON SUB-PU-BEWEGUNGSINFORMATIONEN IN DER 3D-VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2016/43] | English: | METHOD FOR SUB-PU MOTION INFORMATION INHERITANCE IN 3D VIDEO CODING | [2016/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'HÉRITAGE D'INFORMATIONS DE MOUVEMENT DE PU SECONDAIRE DANS UN CODAGE VIDÉO 3D | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 12.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.02.2019 | 20.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/30] | 18.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013139250 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] *; | [XDY] - CHEN Y ET AL, "CE2: Sub-PU based MPI", 7. JCT-3V MEETING; 11-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, (20140103), no. JCT3V-G0119, XP030131892 [XD] 1-3,9-12 * sections 1, 2 * [Y] 4-8,13-15 | [XDY] - Ying Chen ET AL, "Joint Collaborative Team on 3D Video Coding Extensions of ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 and ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11 7th Meeting: San Document: JCT3V-G0119_text Title: Proposed text for JCT3V-G0119 based on 3D-HEVC Draft Text 2 Status: Input Document", (20140103), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct3v/doc_end_user/current_document.php?id=1732, (20150204), XP055167117 [XD] 1-3,9-12 * section 2 * [Y] 4-8,13-15 | [YA] - LIU H ET AL, "CE1: Simplifications to sub-PU level inter-view motion prediction", 7. JCT-3V MEETING; 11-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, (20140108), no. JCT3V-G0120-v2, XP030131894 [Y] 4-8,13-15 * section 2 * [A] 1-3,9-12 | [A] - HE L ET AL, "Enhanced motion parameter inheritance for depth coding in 3D-HEVC", 5. JCT-3V MEETING; 27-7-2013 - 2-8-2013; VIENNA; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, (20130719), no. JCT3V-E0229, XP030131282 [A] 1-15 * section 2 * | International search | [A]CN101911700 (THOMSON LICENSING); | [A]US2011069760 (LEE JIN YOUNG [KR], et al); | [A]WO2010043773 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]CN102356637 (THOMSON LICENSING); | [A] - CHEN, YING ET AL., "CE2: Sub-PU based MPI", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSIONS OF ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 AND ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11, 7TH MEETING, SAN JOSE, US, (20140117), XP055167117 | by applicant | WO2013139250 | - GERHARD TECH ET AL., "3D-HEVC Draft Text 2", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 AND ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11, 6TH MEETING: GENEVA |