EP3097322 - TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. Patent Department 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2017/07] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Borgwarner Inc. Patent Department 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Florian Friedrich-Fröbel-Straße 19/1 68766 Hockenheim / DE | 02 /
SAXENA, Viren Angelstraße 16g 68199 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
BOELLING, Jochen Hasensprung 7 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | [2020/33] |
Former [2016/48] | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Florian Anemonenstrasse 28 37308 Heilbad Heiligenstadt / DE | ||
02 /
SAXENA, Viren Rheingoldstrasse 81 68199 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
BOELLING, Jochen Hasensprung 7 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | Representative(s) | Leckel, Ulf Leckel-Patentanwaltskanzlei Speyerer Straße 6 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/34] | Leckel, Ulf LECKEL Patentanwaltskanzlei Postfach 12 11 22 68062 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2016/48] | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 15740218.1 | 21.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015US12175 | Priority number, date | DE20141001016 | 25.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014001016 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015112550 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3097322 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3097322 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12, F16F15/131, F16F15/14, F16D3/12, F16F15/134 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
F16F15/13157 (EP,US);
F16F15/131 (KR);
F16F15/1333 (US);
F16D3/12 (US);
F16F15/12 (KR);
F16F15/134 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | F16F15/12, F16F15/131 | Designated contracting states | DE [2020/33] |
Former [2016/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHSCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER | [2016/48] | English: | TORSIONAL VIBRATION DAMPER | [2016/48] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE VIBRATIONS DE TORSION | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 30.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2013075908 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-5,12 * figure 2 * [A] 6-11,13,14,16 [I] 15; | [XAI]WO2013152908 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-4,12 * figure 37 * [A] 5-11,13,14,16[I] 15; | [E]WO2015063430 (VALEO EMBRAYAGES [FR]) [E] 1-4,12-14,16 * page 2, lines 17-24; figures 1,5 * | International search | [A]US6601472 (BARON JOACHIM [DE]); | [A]JP2005299742 (CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD); | [Y]US2010210365 (SCHOBER MARTIN [AT], et al); | [Y]JP2012077810 (AISIN AW CO); | [A]JP2012077827 (AISIN AW CO) | by applicant | WO2013075908 | WO2015063430 |