EP3097943 - MICRONEEDLE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Hiroyuki c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1 Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Toshiyuki c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1 Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 15740221.5 | 22.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015JP51732 | Priority number, date | JP20140011523 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014011523 | [2016/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015111672 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3097943 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
A61M37/0015 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0023 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0046 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Title | German: | MIKRONADELEINHEIT | [2016/48] | English: | MICRONEEDLE UNIT | [2016/48] | French: | UNITÉ DE MICRO-AIGUILLE | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2016 | Translation filed | 04.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2399643 (MEDRX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 32; figures 1-19 *; | [X]WO2009107806 (MEDRX CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 25, paragraph 76; figures 1-29 *; | [XI]US2006047242 (LAURENT PHILLIPE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 55; figures 1A-7B * [I] 3-5,7; | [A]US2008114298 (CANTOR ADAM S [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 55; figures 1A-11 * | International search | [X]JP2009507576 (ALZA CORP.); | [Y]WO2009107806 (MEDRX CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2008543528 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO.); | [A]JP2013215621 (CORIUM INTERNATL INC) | by applicant | WO2008020632 |