EP3096798 - PLASMA KALLIKREIN BINDING PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF IN TREATING HEREDITARY ANGIOEDEMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2021/36] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states Dyax Corp. 300 Shire Way Lexington, MA 02421 / US | ||
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Dyax Corp. 55 Network Drive Burlington, MA 01803-2756 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHYUNG, Yung 2521 Massaschusetts Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 02 /
SEXTON, Daniel J. 59 Marvin Road Melrose, MA 02176 / US | 03 /
TENHOOR, Christopher 10 Wedgewood Drive Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | 04 /
KENNISTON, Jon A. 8 Longmeadow Road Hingham, MA 02043 / US | 05 /
FAUCETTE, Ryan 29 Birch Hill Road Melrose, MA 02176 / US | 06 /
IARROBINO, Ryan 43 Bean Road Sterling, MA 01564 / US | 07 /
BIEDENKAPP, Joseph 237 Tremont Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | 08 /
ADELMAN, Burt 210 Old Pickard Road Concord MA 01742 / US | [2017/08] |
Former [2017/02] | 01 /
CHYUNG, Yung 2521 Massaschusetts Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | ||
02 /
SEXTON, Daniel J. 59 Marvin Road Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
03 /
TENHOOR, Christopher 10 Wedgewood Drive Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | |||
04 /
KENNISTON, Jon A. 8 Longmeadow Road Hingham, MA 02043 / US | |||
05 /
FAUCETTE, Ryan 1357 Massachusetts Avenue Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
06 /
IARROBINO, Ryan 43 Bean Road Sterling, MA 01564 / US | |||
07 /
BIEDENKAPP, Joseph 237 Tremont Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | |||
08 /
ADELMAN, Burt 210 Old Pickard Road Concord MA 01742 / US | |||
Former [2016/48] | 01 /
CHYUNG, Yung 2521 Massaschusetts Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | ||
02 /
SEXTON, Daniel J. 59 Marvin Road Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
03 /
TENHOOR, Christopher 10 Wedgewood Drive Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | |||
04 /
KENNISTON, Jon A. 8 Longmeadow Road Hingham, MA 02043 / US | |||
05 /
FAUCETTE, Ryan 1357 Massachusetts Avenue Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
06 /
LARROBINO, Ryan 43 Bean Road Sterling, MA 01564 / US | |||
07 /
BIEDENKAPP, Joseph 237 Tremont Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | |||
08 /
ADELMAN, Burt 210 Old Pickard Road Concord MA 01742 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 15740774.3 | 21.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015US12212 | Priority number, date | US201461929716P | 21.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461929716 P | US201461944361P | 25.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461944361 P | US201462021397P | 07.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462021397 P | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015112578 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096798 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3096798 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61K39/395, C07K16/00, G01N33/53 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (IL);
A61P7/10 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C12Y207/03002 (IL);
C12Y304/21034 (IL);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (KR);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLASMAKALLIKREINBINDENDE PROTEINE UND VERWENDUNGEN BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON HEREDITÄREM ANGIOÖDEM | [2016/48] | English: | PLASMA KALLIKREIN BINDING PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF IN TREATING HEREDITARY ANGIOEDEMA | [2016/48] | French: | PROTÉINES DE LIAISON À LA KALLICRÉINE PLASMATIQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'OEDÈME DE QUINCKE HÉRÉDITAIRE | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 20.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20209536.0 / EP3848057 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2015 | AL | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | LU | 21.01.2021 | BG | 25.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.01.2015 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 21.01.2015 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 25.11.2020 | |
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 25.11.2020 | |
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | LV | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011085103 (DYAX CORP, et al); | International search | [A]US5444156 (VELOSO DULCE C [US], et al); | [X]US2012201756 (SEXTON DANIEL J [US]); | by applicant | US4399216 | US4522811 | US4634665 | WO8704462 | US4704692 | US4881175 | US4946778 | US5179017 | US5260203 | US5374548 | US5399331 | WO9521601 | US5565332 | US5580717 | US5693762 | US5733743 | US5849992 | US6265150 | US6407213 | WO03103475 | WO2011085103 |