EP3169978 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING LOCATION DEPENDENT DATA BY MEANS OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, HR, NO, RS, SE | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWEMMER, Klaus Konrad-Beste-Str. 8 38176 Wendeburg / DE | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 15741143.0 | 15.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015EP66125 | Priority number, date | DE201410213915 | 17.07.2014 Original published format: DE102014213915 | [2017/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016008907 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169978 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169978 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36, G01C21/00, H04W4/02, H04W4/44 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G01C21/362 (EP);
G01C21/3837 (EP);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/44 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | G01C21/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VON ORTSABHÄNGIGEN DATEN MITTELS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2017/21] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING LOCATION DEPENDENT DATA BY MEANS OF A VEHICLE | [2017/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR ACQUÉRIR DES DONNÉES DÉPENDANTES DE LA LOCALISATION AU MOYEN D'UN VEHICULE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 30.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.06.2023 | 27.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1903310 (REIGNCOM LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0042] *; | [X]US2010134637 (CHO SHISEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0110] *; | [X]US2010241349 (WU JASON [TW]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022] *; | [X]EP2442291 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]US2013250119 (XU WILSON [CN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0039] *; | [X]US2014136098 (STROILA MATEI NICOLAE [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0077]; claim 18 * | Examination | WO2012062764 | by applicant | US2013057686 |