EP3170045 - AUTOMATIC TRAJECTORY-MAPPING SYSTEM FOR OPTICAL MICROSCOPE, BASED ON A SMART HIGH-SPEED CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photon Lines 99 rue Péreire Parc Péreire Bâtiment B 78100 Saint Germain En Laye / FR | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREAN, Eric 7 allée Antonio Vivaldi F-35760 Saint Gregoire / FR | 02 /
LALOUM, Eric 326 rue Saint Jacques F-75005 Paris / FR | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Pontet Allano & Associes Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15741521.7 | 15.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015EP66214 | Priority number, date | FR20140056964 | 18.07.2014 Original published format: FR 1456964 | [2017/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016008952 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3170045 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/24, G02B21/36 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
G02B21/244 (EP);
G02B21/16 (EP);
G02B21/365 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN TRAJEKTORIEABBILDUNG FÜR OPTISCHES MIKROSKOP, BASIEREND AUF EINER INTELLIGENTEN HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSKAMERA | [2017/21] | English: | AUTOMATIC TRAJECTORY-MAPPING SYSTEM FOR OPTICAL MICROSCOPE, BASED ON A SMART HIGH-SPEED CAMERA | [2017/21] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAJECTOGRAPHIE AUTOMATIQUE POUR MICROSCOPE OPTIQUE BASE SUR UNE CAMERA RAPIDE INTELLIGENTE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 14.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 11.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005056767 (KAPLAN ERAN [IL], et al) [Y] 1* paragraph [0117] *; | [XYI]US2008266652 (YAZDANFAR SIAVASH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-15,17-19 * paragraphs [0017] - [0040] - [0052] - [0058]; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 1 [I] 4,5,8,9,16 |