EP3194544 - WHITENING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC, A Company Registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424 Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC, A Company Registered in England and Wales under Company no. 41424 Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATCHELOR, Stephen, Norman Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15742294.0 | 28.07.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015EP67302 | Priority number, date | EP20140185263 | 18.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14185263 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016041677 | Date: | 24.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3194544 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/37, C11D1/83, C11D3/00, C11D3/10, C11D3/12, C11D3/37, C11D3/50, C11D11/00, C11D17/06, C11D1/14, C11D1/22, C11D1/29, C11D1/72 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/22 (EP,CN,US);
C11D1/146 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US);
C11D1/37 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D17/06 (EP,CN,US);
C11D3/0036 (EP,CN,US);
C11D3/3707 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | BLEICHUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2017/30] | English: | WHITENING COMPOSITION | [2017/30] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BLANCHIMENT | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 13.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]GB2007692 (RHONE POULENC IND) [I] 1-18 * page 1, lines 25-35, 40-41 * * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 36 * * page 5, lines 15-33, 43-46 * * page 10, lines 2-21 * * page 19; example 21 * * claim - *; | [AD]CA1210009 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [AD] 1-18 * page 1, lines 6-8 * * page 3, lines 28-30 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 3 * * page 41, lines 18-26 * * example I *; | [A]WO9623864 (RHONE POULENC INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 3, lines 4-9 * * page 6, lines 1-12 * * claim - *; | [A]US2004087458 (IKEBATA KAZU [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 8] * * example 1 ** claim - *; | [IA]WO2013030169 (AKZO NOBEL CHEMICALS INT BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-3,5-13,15-18 * page 4, line 13 - page 6, line 19 * * example - * * claim - * [A] 4,14 |