EP3190916 - FOOTWEAR LACING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONRAD, Bryan P. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | 02 /
LYTTLE, Amy c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | 03 /
MCFARLAND, Billy c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | 04 /
NGUYEN, Phuc c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | 05 /
TORAYA, Erin c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2019/12] |
Former [2017/29] | 01 /
CONRAD, Bryan, P. c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | ||
02 /
LYTTLE, Amy c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | |||
03 /
MCFARLAND, Billy c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | |||
04 /
NGUYEN, Phuc c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | |||
05 /
TORAYA, Erin c/o Nike Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 15745132.9 | 28.07.2015 | [2017/29] | WO2015US42432 | Priority number, date | US201414481365 | 09.09.2014 Original published format: US201414481365 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016039879 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3190916 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3190916 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A43C1/00, A43C9/00, A43C7/00 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
A43C1/00 (EP);
A43C7/00 (EP,CN);
A43C1/006 (EP);
A43C11/00 (CN);
A43C9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNÜRSYSTEM FÜR SCHUHWERK | [2017/29] | English: | FOOTWEAR LACING SYSTEM | [2017/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LAÇAGE DE CHAUSSURES | [2017/29] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 17.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2015 | AL | 20.03.2019 | AT | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | IT | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SE | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | IE | 28.07.2019 | LU | 28.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.07.2015 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 28.07.2015 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3934346 (SASAKI KYOZO, et al) [A] 1,2,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003051374 (FREED ANNA B [US]) [A] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0061] - [0080]; figures 2A-6L *; | [A]US2004078999 (FREED ANNA B [US]) [A] 1,2,8* paragraphs [0072] - [0098]; figures 2A-7H *; | [XA]US2008127511 (FRITON MICHAEL R [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0040] - [0064]; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,8; | [XDA]US2013086815 (TORAYA ERIN ELIZABETH [US]) [XD] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,8 |