EP3172504 - ABSORPTION HEAT PUMP DEVICE INCLUDING DISCHARGE OF THE COMBUSTION FUMES TO AN EVAPORATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/22] | ABSORPTION HEAT PUMP DEVICE HAVING A GAS ENGINE AND INCLUDING DISCHARGE OF THE COMBUSTION FUMES TO AN EVAPORATOR | ||
[2020/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUDEHENN, François Maleon 07190 Saint Sauveur de Montagut / FR | 02 /
PAPILLON, Philippe 158 rue du Bois de Candie 73000 Chambéry / FR | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15745170.9 | 21.07.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015EP66620 | Priority number, date | FR20140057155 | 24.07.2014 Original published format: FR 1457155 | [2017/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016012436 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3172504 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3172504 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F25B30/04, F25B33/00, F25B35/02 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
F25B30/04 (EP);
F25B35/02 (EP);
F25B2315/002 (EP);
Y02A30/27 (EP);
Y02B30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSORPTIONSWÄRMEPUMPENVORRICHTUNG MIT FÜHRUNG DER VERBRENNUNGABGASE ZU EINEM VERDAMPFER | [2020/47] | English: | ABSORPTION HEAT PUMP DEVICE INCLUDING DISCHARGE OF THE COMBUSTION FUMES TO AN EVAPORATOR | [2020/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POMPE À CHALEUR À ABSORPTION GAZ COMPORTANT UNE ÉVACUATION DES FUMÉES DE COMBUSTION VERS UN EVAPORATEUR | [2020/47] |
Former [2017/22] | ABSORPTIONSWÄRMEPUMPENVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM GASMOTOR UND MIT ENTLADUNG DER VERBRENNUNGSDÄMPFE ZU EINEM VERDAMPFER | ||
Former [2017/22] | ABSORPTION HEAT PUMP DEVICE HAVING A GAS ENGINE AND INCLUDING DISCHARGE OF THE COMBUSTION FUMES TO AN EVAPORATOR | ||
Former [2017/22] | DISPOSITIF DE POMPE À CHALEUR À ABSORPTION À MOTEUR GAZ COMPORTANT UNE ÉVACUATION DES FUMÉES DE COMBUSTION VERS UN EVAPORATEURÉ | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 25.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2015 | AL | 14.04.2021 | AT | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | MT | 14.04.2021 | NL | 14.04.2021 | PL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | IE | 21.07.2021 | LU | 21.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.07.2015 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.07.2015 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 21.07.2015 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE2648855 (HERBST DONALD) [X] 1-3,9,11 * page 5 - page 17 *[I] 4-8,10,12-15; | [XI]WO2010129949 (STONE MOUNTAIN TECHNOLOGIES IN [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9-11 * page 4 - page 13; figures 1-9 * [I] 4-6,8,12-15 |