EP3169635 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FORMING PERFORATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOOKBINDER, Dana Craig 2675 Davis Road Corning, New York 14830 / US | 02 /
LOGUNOV, Stephan Lvovich 2780 Pinewood Circle Corning, New York 14830 / US | 03 /
NIEBER, Albert Roth 4 LAC Lane Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 04 /
TANDON, Pushkar 3405 Deer Crest Drive Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 05 /
TSUDA, Sergio 10 Barrington Road Horseheads, New York 14845 / US | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2022/47] |
Former [2017/21] | Scott, Mark Andrew Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15745643.5 | 14.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015US40250 | Priority number, date | US201462024070P | 14.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462024070 P | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016010949 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169635 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169635 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C03B33/02, B23K26/00, B23K26/53, B23K103/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
C03B33/0222 (EP,US);
B23K26/0006 (EP,US);
B23K26/50 (US);
B23K26/53 (EP,US);
B23K2103/54 (EP,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | C03B33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PERFORATIONEN | [2017/21] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FORMING PERFORATIONS | [2017/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR FORMER DES PERFORATIONS | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2023
21.08.2023
ADMISSIBLE Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/39] | 04.09.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.01.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | AT | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | NL | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SE | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | GB | 14.07.2023 | IE | 14.07.2023 | LU | 14.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
IT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
GB | 14.07.2023 | ||
LU | 14.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
GB | 14.07.2023 | ||
LU | 14.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 14.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0938946 (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [I]US2007202619 (TAMURA MUNEO [JP], et al) [I] 1-30* paragraph [0002]; figures 1-11,20 *; | [XI]US2013068736 (MIELKE MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11,17,18,27,28 * paragraph [0033]; figure 3 * [I] 2-9,12-16,19-26,29,30; | [XI]US2013126573 (HOSSEINI S ABBAS [CA], et al) [X] 1,10,11,17,18,27,28 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0052] , [0074] - [0077] - [0081] , [0083]; claims 19,20 * [I] 2-9,12-16,19-26,29,30 | Opposition | EP1338371 | US2004232124 | US2011049765 | WO2012006736 | US2013323469 | US2014036338 | DE102012110971 | EP2754524 | WO2014121261 | WO2015010706 | - Hoff Kyle, Li Xinghua, Glaesemann G. Scott, "Laser Controlled Fracture Strength in Chemically Strengthened Glass", International Optical Design Conference and Optical Fabrication and Testing, OSA, Washington, D.C., Washington, D.C., (20100101), doi:10.1364/OFT.2010.OWB1, ISBN 978-1-55752-893-3, page OWB1, XP093112860 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OFT.2010.OWB1 | - Nolte Stefan, Will Matthias, Augustin Markus, Triebel Peter, Zoellner Karsten, Tuennermann Andreas, "Cutting of optical materials by using femtosecond laser pulses", Proceedings of SPIE, SPIE, (20011109), vol. 4440, doi:10.1117/12.448036, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 152 - 160, XP093112861 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.448036 | - Anderson T. L., "Linear Elastic Fracture Mechanics", Fracture Mechanics. Fundamentals and Applications. 3RD ED., TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (20050101), pages 50 - 51, ISBN 978-1-4200-5821-5, XP093112862 | - Tsai Wu-Jung; Gu Chun-Jen; Cheng Chung-Wei; Horng Ji-Bin, "Internal modification for cutting transparent glass using femtosecond Bessel beams", Optical Engineering, SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS., BELLINGHAM, BELLINGHAM , (20140501), vol. 53, no. 5, doi:10.1117/1.OE.53.5.051503, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 051503 - 051503, XP060146245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.OE.53.5.051503 | - Butkus Simas, Domas Paipulas, Romualdas Sirutkaitis, Eugenijus Gaižauskas, Valdas Sirutkaitis, "Rapid Cutting and Drilling of Transparent Materials via Femtosecond Laser Filamentation", Journal of Laser Micro Nanoengineering, Reza Netsu Kako Kenkyukai, JP, JP , (20141101), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:10.2961/jlmn.2014.03.0006, ISSN 1880-0688, pages 213 - 220, XP093112863 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2961/jlmn.2014.03.0006 |