EP3088166 - PREPREG SHEET AUTOMATIC LAMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/44] | COMPACTOR AND PREPREG SHEET AUTOMATIC LAMINATION DEVICE | ||
[2018/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSURUTA Megumu c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
SHIBUTANI Takashi c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
SAEKI Kentarou c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 04 /
NODA Yoshitomo c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 05 /
OWATARI Kosuke c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15745770.6 | 09.01.2015 | [2016/44] | WO2015JP50559 | Priority number, date | JP20140023709 | 10.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014023709 | [2016/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015118903 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088166 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3088166 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/34, B29C70/38, // B29L9/00, B29K105/08 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
B29C43/3697 (EP,US);
B29C43/22 (EP,US);
B29C70/38 (EP,US);
B29C70/504 (US);
B29C2043/3422 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0863 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0872 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/44] | B29C70/06, B29C43/34, B29K105/08, B29L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN PREPREGMATTENLAMINIERUNG | [2018/44] | English: | PREPREG SHEET AUTOMATIC LAMINATION DEVICE | [2018/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STRATIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE DE FEUILLE PRÉIMPRÉGNÉE | [2018/44] |
Former [2016/44] | VERDICHTER UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN PREPREGMATTENLAMINIERUNG | ||
Former [2016/44] | COMPACTOR AND PREPREG SHEET AUTOMATIC LAMINATION DEVICE | ||
Former [2016/44] | COMPACTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE STRATIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE DE FEUILLE PRÉIMPRÉGNÉE | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2016 | Translation filed | 26.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 14.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2015 | AL | 03.04.2019 | AT | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | DK | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | IT | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 09.01.2015 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5839845U (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO., LTD.) [Y] 7* page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 8; figures 2,3 *; | JPH01294165 [ ] (SHIN NIPPON KOKI CO LTD); | [Y]US5011563 (SHINNO NOBUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | JPH04308733 [ ] (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD); | [Y]US5288357 (YAMADA HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, lines 1-10 * * column 2, lines 18-35 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 11; figure 1 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 7 *; | [IY]WO2013159137 (FILL GMBH [AT]) [I] 1-8 * page 1, lines 1-22 * * page 2, lines 14-29 * * page 4, lines 1-3,13-21 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 9; figure 7 * * page 12, lines 6-12; figures 12-19 * [Y] 1-8 | International search | [Y]JPS5839845U (Toshiba Machine Co., Ltd.) [Y] 7 * , claims; specification, page 3, line 14 to page 4, line 8 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH01294165 (SHIN NIPPON KOKI CO LTD) [Y] 4-7 * , claims; page 2, lower right column, line 14 to page 3, upper left column, line 1; page 4, lower right column, lines 4 to 12; page 5, lower left column, lines 3 to 10; fig. 1, 5, 6, 8 & US 5011563 A *; | [YA]JPH04308733 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * , claims; paragraphs [0005], [0014], [0016]; fig. 1 & US 5288357 A & DE 4211866 A1 * [A] 8, 9; | [A]JPH04344225 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-9 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2011078336 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * , claims; fig. 6 & US 2012/0186730 A1 & EP 2517863 A1 & WO 2011/078336 A1 & AU 2010336190 A & CN 102470611 A & MX 2012002860 A & KR 10-2012-0040206 A *; | [A]US2012305175 (WAMPLER ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0034], [0035] (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2013028062 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [Y] 1-7 * , claims; paragraphs [0023], [0024], [0033]; fig. 3, 4 (Family: none) * [A] 8, 9; | [EA]WO2014073090 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [EA] 1-9* , claims; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * |