EP3107297 - VIDEO ENCODING DEVICE, VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Takayuki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
SHIMOFURE, Kensuke c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
TSUJI, Naoya c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 04 /
NAGAYAMA, Suguru c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 05 /
CHONO, Keiichi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 15745873.8 | 29.01.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015JP00399 | Priority number, date | JP20140023089 | 10.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014023089 | [2016/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015118841 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107297 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/436, H04N19/40 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
H04N19/436 (EP,US);
H04N19/167 (US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/40 (EP,US);
H04N19/513 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | H04N19/436 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Title | German: | VIDEOCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VIDEOCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2016/51] | English: | VIDEO ENCODING DEVICE, VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2016/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE VIDÉO, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE VIDÉO ET PROGRAMME | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2016 | Translation filed | 15.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012275516 (TANAKA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * figures 9,10,12,16-30 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0 82] , [0 99] , [ 288] - [0303] - [0401] - [0404] * * paragraphs [0060] , [ 110] , [ 124] , [ 135] - [0149] - [0189] , [ 191] * * paragraph [0172] - paragraph [0212] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0221] *; | [X]WO2013067311 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * figures 9, 10 * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0117] *; | [A] - DONG ZHANG ET AL, "Fast Transcoding from H.264 AVC to High Efficiency Video Coding", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO (ICME), 2012 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120709), doi:10.1109/ICME.2012.112, ISBN 978-1-4673-1659-0, pages 651 - 656, XP032235754 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [00II] - paragraph [0III] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2012.112 | [A] - TONG SHEN ET AL, "Ultra Fast H.264/AVC to HEVC Transcoder", DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE (DCC), 2013, IEEE, (20130320), doi:10.1109/DCC.2013.32, ISBN 978-1-4673-6037-1, pages 241 - 250, XP032429416 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0III] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DCC.2013.32 | [A] - CHI CHING CHI ET AL, "Parallel Scalability and Efficiency of HEVC Parallelization Approaches", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (20121201), vol. 22, no. 12, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2012.2223056, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1827 - 1838, XP011487165 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [00II] - paragraph [00IV] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2012.2223056 | [A] - HENRYK RICHTER ET AL, "Architectural decomposition of video decoders for many core architectures", DESIGN AND ARCHITECTURES FOR SIGNAL AND IMAGE PROCESSING (DASIP), 2012 CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20121023), ISBN 978-1-4673-2089-4, pages 1 - 8, XP032291122 [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * | International search | [A]JPH10234043 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0060] to [0070], [0089]; fig. 9 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11122610 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-12 * , abstract; paragraphs [0014] to [0039]; fig. 1, 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2004349756 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 1-3, 5-7, 9-11 * , abstract; paragraphs [0002] to [0017]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2006517369 (Nextream France) [Y] 1-3, 5-7, 9-11 * , abstract; paragraphs [0001] to [0006], [0061] to [0070]; fig. 1 to 4 & WO 2004/070950 A2 & EP 1593271 A2 & US 2006/0274832 A1 & KR 10-2005-0095648 A & CN 1748429 A *; | [Y]JP2007013864 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) [Y] 1-3, 5-7, 9-11 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0006]; fig. 9 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009055440 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-12* , abstract; paragraphs [0001] to [0030]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) * |