EP3102143 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NON-RIGID DEFORMATION OF TISSUE FOR VIRTUAL NAVIGATION OF INTERVENTIONAL TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOPRA, Prashant 870 East El Camino Real Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
DUINDAM, Vincent 2005 California St. Apt. 5 Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Tao 1022 Sumac Dr. Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 04 /
XU, Lei 1020 Kifer Rd. Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15745879.5 | 03.02.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015US14226 | Priority number, date | US201461935547P | 04.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461935547 P | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015119935 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3102143 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/00, G06T19/20, A61B34/30, A61B34/10 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
A61B34/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B34/30 (EP,KR,US);
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/107 (US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/2061 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/50] | A61B90/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR NICHTSTARRE VERFORMUNG VON GEWEBE ZUR VIRTUELLEN NAVIGATION VON INTERVENTIONELLEN INSTRUMENTEN | [2016/50] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NON-RIGID DEFORMATION OF TISSUE FOR VIRTUAL NAVIGATION OF INTERVENTIONAL TOOLS | [2016/50] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉFORMATION NON RIGIDE DE TISSUS POUR LA NAVIGATION VIRTUELLE D'OUTILS D'INTERVENTION | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 30.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/07] | 04.10.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/07] | Divisional application(s) | EP21211424.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013303893 (DUINDAM VINCENT [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2006149134 (SOPER TIMOTHY D [US], et al); | [A]US2007167738 (TIMINGER HOLGER [DE], et al); | [A]US2007231779 (SANTHANAM ANAND P [US], et al); | [A]US2011093243 (TAWHAI MERRYN H [NZ], et al); | [X]US2013303893 (DUINDAM VINCENT [US], et al) |