EP3104549 - HOME APPLIANCE, NETWORK CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR HOME APPLIANCE AND NETWORK CONNECTION METHOD OF HOME APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Hee Kyung 128-1 Sinwon-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-390 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Se Il 58 Migeumil-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-743 / KR | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/50] | Application number, filing date | 15746422.3 | 27.01.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015KR00847 | Priority number, date | KR20140013455 | 06.02.2014 Original published format: KR 20140013455 | [2016/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015119394 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3104549 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3104549 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/14, H04L12/12, H04L12/28, H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W12/08, H04W60/00, H04W84/18 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
H04L12/12 (EP,US);
G01S17/36 (US);
G01S17/931 (US);
G01S7/4915 (US);
G01S7/499 (US);
H04L12/2807 (US);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04L63/10 (US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/27] | H04L9/32, H04L12/12, H04L29/06, H04L12/28, H04W12/06, H04W12/08, H04W60/00, H04W76/02, H04W84/18 | ||
Former IPC [2016/50] | H04L9/32, H04L12/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSVORRICHTUNG, NETZWERKVERBINDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE HAUSHALTSVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKANSCHLUSSVERFAHREN EINER HAUSHALTSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/50] | English: | HOME APPLIANCE, NETWORK CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR HOME APPLIANCE AND NETWORK CONNECTION METHOD OF HOME APPLIANCE | [2016/50] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER, SYSTÈME DE CONNEXION RÉSEAU POUR UN APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONNEXION RÉSEAU D'UN APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2016 | Translation filed | 22.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 22.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2018 | Observations by third parties | 08.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20155321.1 / EP3672148 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2015 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | ES | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | NL | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | RS | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.01.2015 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MK | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 27.01.2015 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 27.01.2015 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005149758 (PARK SUNG-JOON [KR]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-5; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US2007266246 (LEE YUNG-JI [KR], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraphs [0052] , [0054] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraphs [0059] , [0063] - paragraph [0072]; figures 2-6; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2010205655 (MOKUYA SENICHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0066]; claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO2012060021 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0049]; figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055]; claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP2498469 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0088]; claims 1-15 *; | [X]EP2611079 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0043]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0058]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0080]; figure 5; claims 1-15 *; | [A] - GEON-WOO KIM ETRI KOREA, "Proposal for revised draft Recommendation X.homesec-4: Authorization framework for home network", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20080905), vol. 9/17, pages 1 - 30, XP017548387 [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [Annex A] - paragraph [Appendix II] * | International search | [A]JP2004355396 (NTT COMM KK) [A] 1-29* See paragraphs [0024]-[0087]; and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2006251256 (ASOKAN NADARAJAH [FI], et al) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0040]; and figures 3, 4. *; | [A]US2010205655 (MOKUYA SENICHI [JP]) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0046]; and figures 1A-3. *; | [A]JP2013085050 (HITACHI CONSUMER ELECTRONICS) [A] 1-29 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0057]; and figures 1-8. *; | [X]KR20130080487 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-29 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0068]; and figures 1-4. * | other | EP1309127 | WO2013015656 | EP2611079 |