EP3102681 - TRIFUNCTIONAL T CELL-ANTIGEN COUPLER AND METHODS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMaster University McMaster Industry Liaison Office McMaster Innovation Park 175 Longwood Road South Suite 305 Hamilton, Ontario L8P 0A1 / CA | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMSON, Jonathan 260 Callaghan Crescent Oakville, Ontario L6H 5H9 / CA | 02 /
HELSEN, Christopher W. 2296 Guildstone Crescent Oakville, Ontario L6M 3Y7 / CA | 03 /
DENISOVA, Galina 1856 Main Street W. Apt. 512 Hamilton, Ontario L8S 1J2 / CA | 04 /
GIRI, Rajanish 71/7C/1 Saray Lala Ki Telliarganj Allahabad UP 211004 / IN | 05 /
MWAWASI, Kenneth Anthony 1001 Main Street W. Apt. 1122 Hamilton, Ontario L8S 1A9 / CA | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/40] |
Former [2016/50] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15746948.7 | 06.02.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015CA00068 | Priority number, date | US201461936906P | 07.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461936906 P | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015117229 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3102681 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3102681 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, A61K35/17, A61P35/00, C07K14/725, C07K16/00, C07K16/28, C07K19/00, C12N15/85, C12N5/10, C07K16/32, C07K14/73 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/70514 (US);
A61K35/17 (KR);
A61K39/0005 (KR);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/4632 (EP,US);
A61K39/464406 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K16/2809 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2878 (US);
C07K16/32 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/5156 (US);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2318/10 (KR);
C07K2318/20 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (KR);
C07K2319/03 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/33 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/50] | C12N15/62, A61K35/17, A61P35/00, C07K14/725, C07K16/00, C07K16/28, C07K19/00, C12N15/85, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRIFUNKTIONALER T-ZELL-ANTIGENKOPPLER SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2016/50] | English: | TRIFUNCTIONAL T CELL-ANTIGEN COUPLER AND METHODS AND USES THEREOF | [2016/50] | French: | COUPLEUR D'ANTIGÈNES DES LYMPHOCYTES T TRIFONCTIONNEL ET MÉTHODES ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 26.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2019 | Observations by third parties | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23199169.6 / EP4317180 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2013092001 (SYNIMMUNE GMBH [DE]); | [XY]WO2014011988 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]); | Examination | WO9957268 | by applicant | WO9957268 | WO2014011988 |