EP3174992 - METHOD FOR ENZYME-CATALYZED PRODUCTION OF PREPOLYMERS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/23] | METHOD FOR THE ENZYME-CATALYSED PRODUCTION OF PREPOLYMERS FOR PRODUCUNG PLASTICS | ||
[2020/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Hermann-von-Helmholtz-Platz 1 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | For all designated states BioPro Baden-Württemberg GmbH Alexanderstr. 5 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/33] |
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Hermann-von-Helmholtz-Platz 1 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states Biopro Baden-Württemberg GmbH Breitscheidstraße 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYLDATK, Christoph Uhlandstraße 25 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
KINDERVATER, Ralf Furthstraße 5 75931 Gechingen / DE | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/15] |
Former [2017/23] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15747135.0 | 29.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015EP67358 | Priority number, date | DE201410215081 | 31.07.2014 Original published format: DE102014215081 | [2017/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016016293 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174992 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3174992 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/02, B01D71/56, C08F290/06 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
C12P13/02 (EP,US);
C08F290/065 (EP,US);
C08G63/06 (US);
C08G63/16 (US);
C08G63/82 (US);
C08G69/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENZYMKATALYSIERTEN HERSTELLUNG VON PRÄPOLYMEREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON KUNSTSTOFFEN | [2017/23] | English: | METHOD FOR ENZYME-CATALYZED PRODUCTION OF PREPOLYMERS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF PLASTICS | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUIRE DES PRÉPOLYMÈRES CATALYSÉE PAR UNE ENZYME POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MATIÈRES PLASTIQUES | [2020/47] |
Former [2017/23] | METHOD FOR THE ENZYME-CATALYSED PRODUCTION OF PREPOLYMERS FOR PRODUCUNG PLASTICS | ||
Former [2017/23] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION PAR CATALYSE ENZYMATIQUE DE PRÉPOLYMÈRES DESTINÉS À LA PRODUCTION DE MATIÈRES PLASTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 18.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2015 | AL | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | ES | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | PL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | TR | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | AT | 29.07.2021 | GB | 29.07.2021 | IE | 29.07.2021 | LU | 29.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
AT | 29.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
AT | 29.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
AT | 29.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
AT | 29.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
GB | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 14.04.2021 | |
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 14.04.2021 | |
LT | 14.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9507996 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [Y] 8 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2006058697 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10 * page 1, line 37 - page 4, line 23; examples 1,3 * * page 19, line 20 - line 24 * [Y] 2,8,9; | [XY]WO2006106138 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10 * page 1, line 5 - page 4, line 37 * * page 21, line 14 - page 22, line 11 * * page 30, line 4 - line 9 * [Y] 2,8,9; | [XY]WO2006122922 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 37 * * page 11, line 9 - line 19 * * page 18, line 23 - page 19, line 16 * * page 23, line 38 - line 40 * * page 30, line 18 - line 26 * [Y] 2,8,9; | [Y]WO2009092793 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [Y] 8 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP2738198 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10 * [0002],[0009]-[0012],[0022]-[0026],[0061] * [Y] 2,8,9; | [Y] - YOUNG T-H ET AL, "Morphology of crystalline Nylon-610 membranes prepared by the immersion-precipitation process: competition between crystallization and liquid-liquid phase separation", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (19990801), vol. 40, no. 18, doi:10.1016/S0032-3861(98)00738-1, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 5011 - 5021, XP004164968 [Y] 2,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(98)00738-1 | [Y] - SHIH C-H ET AL, "Morphology of membranes formed by the isothermal precipitation of polyamide solutions from water/formic acid systems", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE 20050505 JOHN WILEY AND SONS INC. US, (20050505), vol. 96, no. 3, doi:10.1002/APP.21545, pages 944 - 960, XP002746284 [Y] 2,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/APP.21545 |