EP3169361 - COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CANCER USING PD-1 AXIS BINDING ANTAGONISTS AND MEK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNTTILA, Melissa c/o Genentech Inc. 1 Dna Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Brodbeck, Michel F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 15747647.4 | 15.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015US40582 | Priority number, date | US201462024988P | 15.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462024988 P | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016011160 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169361 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169361 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/4523 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K39/3955 (IL,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (CN,KR);
A61K39/395 (RU);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P35/04 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2803 (IL,US);
C07K16/2827 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/542 (IL,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR);
C07K2317/52 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/56 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4523, A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP,US) |
Former IPC [2017/21] | A61K39/395, C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR KREBSBEHANDLUNG MIT PD-1-ACHSENBINDENDEN ANTAGONISTEN UND MEK-INHIBITOREN | [2017/21] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CANCER USING PD-1 AXIS BINDING ANTAGONISTS AND MEK INHIBITORS | [2017/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER À L'AIDE D'ANTAGONISTES DE LIAISON À L'AXE PD-1 ET D'INHIBITEURS DE MEK | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 29.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 30.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19172991.2 / EP3563870 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2015 | AL | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | IE | 15.07.2019 | LU | 15.07.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 15.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 15.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 15.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 15.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 15.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
IE | 15.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
LU | 15.07.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2013019906 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO8403506 | WO8403564 | US4708871 | US4816567 | US4833092 | EP0404097 | WO9110741 | WO9311161 | US5223409 | US5403484 | US5428130 | US5475096 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5556762 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571689 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5641870 | US5661016 | US5663143 | US5750373 | WO9824893 | US6075181 | US6150584 | WO03077914 | WO2004042072 | WO2004092219 | WO2005121142 | US6982321 | US7087409 | WO2006121168 | WO2007002325 | WO2007002433 | WO2007005874 | WO2007044515 | WO2007096259 | WO2008024725 | US7491829 | WO2009021887 | WO2009085983 | WO2009101611 | WO2009111278 | WO2009111279 | WO2009111277 | WO2009111280 | WO2009114335 | WO2010027827 | WO2010077634 | WO2011066389 | WO2011066342 | US2013034559 |