EP3120659 - METHOD OF MEASUREMENT ENHANCEMENT ON TURNED-OFF SMALL CELL FOR DUAL CONNECTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Yun 388 Ningqiao Road Pudong Jinqiao Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
WORRALL, Chandrika 11A Balfour Crescent Newbury Berkshire RG14 6SN / GB | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15747841.3 | 17.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015IB00631 | Priority number, date | CN201410109778 | 21.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410109778 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015150912 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3120659 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, H04W88/06 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H04W76/15 (EP,KR,US);
H04W16/32 (KR);
H04W24/10 (KR,US);
H04W48/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSVERSTÄRKUNG BEI EINER AUSGESCHALTETEN KLEINEN ZELLE FÜR DUALE KONNEKTIVITÄT | [2017/04] | English: | METHOD OF MEASUREMENT ENHANCEMENT ON TURNED-OFF SMALL CELL FOR DUAL CONNECTIVITY | [2017/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DU MESURAGE D'UNE PETITE CELLULE DÉSACTIVÉE POUR UNE CONFIGURATION À DOUBLE CONNECTIVITÉ | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 27.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014020996 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [T]EP2882213 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [T] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0030] , [0034] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0041] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0051] , [0053] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] , [0064] , [0066] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0076] , [0087] , [0088] * * paragraphs [0091] , [0097] , [0105] - [0108] - [0113] , [0145] *; | [I] - SAMSUNG, "Overview of small cell on/off scenarios and procedures", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-140367-CELL-ON-OFF-SCENARIOS-AND-PROCEDURES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20140209), XP050735914 [I] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1. Introduction * * page 2, paragraphs 2.1 Handover, 3rd paragraph * * page 5, paragraph 2.3 Dual connectivity * * page 5, paragraph 2.3.1 SeNB additiona and release * * page 6, paragraph 2.3.2 SeNB activation and deactivation * * page 7, paragraph 2.3.3 Layer 1 on/off signalling * * page 10, paragraph 2 * | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Measurement and procedure enhancements for transition time reduction of small cell on/off", vol. RAN WG1, no. Guangzhou, China; 20131007 - 20131011, (20130928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-134065, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74b/Docs/, (20130928), XP050717257 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ITL INC, "Enhanced small cell on/off procedure for single-carrier and multiple-carrier operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20130210 - 20130214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-140669, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20140209), XP050736187 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |