EP3188674 - TORSIONAL ORTHOPAEDIC REVISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radley Scientific Limited Bremridge House Bremridge Ashburton South Devon TQ13 7JX / GB | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Michael John Radley Bremridge House Bremridge Ashburton South Devon TQ13 7JX / GB | 02 /
YOUNG, Stephen Michael Radley Bremridge House Bremridge Ashburton South Devon TQ13 7JX / GB | 03 /
EDE, Michael James Bremridge House Bremridge Ashburton South Devon TQ13 7JX / GB | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Franks & Co (South) Limited Carlton House 26 Billing Road Northampton NN1 5AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Franks & Co (South) Limited Carlton House 26 Billing Road Northampton NN1 5AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15748063.3 | 27.06.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015GB00201 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015198005 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3188674 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3188674 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
A61B17/8847 (EP,US);
A61B17/164 (EP,US);
A61B17/1659 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1602 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320089 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320098 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | A61B17/32, A61B17/88, A61F2/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TORSIONSSYSTEM ZUR ORTHOPÄDISCHEN UNTERSUCHUNG | [2017/28] | English: | TORSIONAL ORTHOPAEDIC REVISION SYSTEM | [2017/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉVISION ORTHOPÉDIQUE DE TORSION | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 02.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2015 | AL | 16.05.2018 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | PT | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | RS | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | LU | 27.06.2018 | MT | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 27.06.2015 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.06.2015 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.06.2015 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
LU | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6425906 (YOUNG MICHAEL JOHN RADLEY [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 5, line 50 - line 65; figures 1,3a-b *; | [A]US2010100139 (YOUNG MICHAEL JOHN RADLEY [GB]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; figure 5 *; | [A]US5697545 (JENNINGS HOWARD TIMOTHY [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 5, line 1251; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US4750488 (WUCHINICH DAVID G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 19-21 * | Examination | US2009236938 | by applicant | WO9303676 | WO9620657 |