EP3104858 - METHODS FOR TREATING BURNS USING ALLANTOIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scioderm, Inc. 1007 Slater Road Suite 170 Durham, NC 27703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states Scioderm Inc. 1007 Slater Road Suite 170 Durham, NC 27703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYAN, Robert 10 Tabby Lane Isle of Palms, SC 29451 / US | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 15749050.9 | 13.02.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015US15781 | Priority number, date | US201461940069P | 14.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461940069 P | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015123503 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3104858 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4166, A61P17/02 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/4166 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | A61K31/4166 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VERBRENNUNGEN MITHILFE VON ALLANTOIN | [2016/51] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING BURNS USING ALLANTOIN | [2016/51] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE BRÛLURES AU MOYEN D'ALLANTOÏNE | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03053369 (ALWYN CO INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * tables 2-4,6 * * paragraph [0227] * * paragraph [0178] * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO0000186 (AMERICAN MEDICAL RESEARCH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * examples 12,13 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO0106991 (ALWYN CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * tables 1,3 * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [XY]US2124295 (GREENBAUM FREDERICK R) [X] 1 * entire document * [Y] 2-5; | [Y]US3079299 (THEODORE HEILIG) [Y] 2-5 * entire document *; | [A]US2013345274 (FARBER ELLIOTT [US]) [A] 1-5 * entire document *; | [XP]US2014213990 (GORINSHTEYN BORIS [US]) [XP] 1-5 * entire document * |