EP3186675 - LIGHTING DEVICE WITH A WAVELENGTH CONVERSION ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTWIG, Ulrich Driesenerstrasse 6 10439 Berlin / DE | [2017/27] | Application number, filing date | 15750007.5 | 30.07.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015EP67486 | Priority number, date | DE201410217326 | 29.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014217326 | [2017/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016030121 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3186675 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/00, G03B21/00, G03B33/08 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
G02B26/008 (EP);
G02B27/1006 (EP);
G02B27/141 (EP);
G02B27/147 (EP);
G03B21/204 (EP);
G03B21/2066 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER WELLENLÄNGENKONVERSIONSANORDNUNG | [2017/27] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE WITH A WAVELENGTH CONVERSION ARRANGEMENT | [2017/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN ENSEMBLE DE CONVERSION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 01.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDAI]CN102591119 (BENQ CORP) [XD] 1-5,9-12,15 * abstract * *Figures* [A] 6-8 [I] 13,14; | [XAI]WO2013067807 (APPOTRONICS CORP LTD [CN]; HU FEI [CN]) [X] 1-5,9-12,15 * abstract * [A] 6-8 [I] 13,14; | [XA]US2012106126 (NOJIMA SHIGEO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-5,9-15 * figures 1,12 * [A] 6-8 |