EP3183082 - ENERGY BEAM SIZE VERIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCAM AB Krokslätts Fabriker 27A 431 37 Mölndal / SE | [2024/09] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states ARCAM AB Krokslätts Fabriker 27A 431 37 Mölndal / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNIS, Anders Vallgången 29 451 62 Uddevalla / SE | [2024/09] |
Former [2017/26] | 01 /
SNIS, Anders Vallgången 29 S-451 62 Uddevalla / SE | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 15750294.9 | 30.07.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015EP67521 | Priority number, date | US201462039626P | 20.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462039626 P | US201462093882P | 18.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462093882 P | US201514750752 | 25.06.2015 Original published format: US201514750752 | US201514750779 | 25.06.2015 Original published format: US201514750779 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016026664 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183082 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3183082 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22F10/31 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
B23K26/032 (EP);
B23K15/0033 (EP,CN);
B22F10/31 (EP);
B23K26/046 (EP);
B23K26/0648 (EP);
B23K26/082 (CN);
B23K26/34 (EP);
B23K26/60 (CN);
B23K26/70 (EP);
B23K26/702 (EP,CN);
B33Y50/00 (EP);
G02B7/10 (EP);
B22F10/28 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/26] | B22F3/105, B23K26/03, B23K26/06, B23K26/34, B23K26/70, G02B7/10, B23K15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER ENERGIESTRAHLGRÖSSE | [2017/26] | English: | ENERGY BEAM SIZE VERIFICATION | [2017/26] | French: | VÉRIFICATION DE LA TAILLE D'UN FAISCEAU D'ÉNERGIE | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 23.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 07.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4443703 (SHIMAZU NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003002055 (KILTHAU ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 10,11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1435640 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [XAYI]US2007173796 (KESSLER RALF [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,16-18,20 * figures 1-2, 7A-7b * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] * * claims 1,6,7,8 * [A] 15,19,23 [Y] 4,10,11,21,22 [I] 5,9,12-14; | [YD]US2009152771 (PHILIPPI JOCHEN [DE], et al) [YD] 4,21,22 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2012055960 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 10,11 * abstract * | by applicant | US2009152771 |