EP3174554 - NANOPARTICLES, METHODS OF PREPARATION, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCIS, Donny Friedberger Landstrasse 118 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
LAMPRECHT, Alf Auf dem Eichholzer Acker 38 50389 Wesseling / DE | 03 /
FOLGER, Martin Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 04 /
HOFFMANN, Ragna Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 05 /
MARTIN-FONTECHA, Alfonso Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 15750303.8 | 30.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015EP67594 | Priority number, date | EP20140179537 | 01.08.2014 Original published format: EP 14179537 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016016401 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174554 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/50 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
A61K47/6937 (EP,US);
A61K9/1676 (US);
A61K39/08 (CN,US);
A61K9/1647 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | NANOPARTIKEL, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2017/23] | English: | NANOPARTICLES, METHODS OF PREPARATION, AND USES THEREOF | [2017/23] | French: | NANOPARTICULES, PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 07.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008051291 (ORDWAY RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13-18 * pages 60, 63, 65, 66, 69, and 168/169;; example 22 *; | [Y]WO2008115641 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * example 2 *; | [X]WO2008124632 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13-18 * example 4 *; | [XYI]US2012156135 (FAROKHZAD OMID C [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13-18 * paragraph [0214]; examples 1,2 * [Y] 12 [I] 10,11; | [X] - JUNG T ET AL, "Sulfobutylated poly(vinyl alcohol)-graft-poly(lactide-co-glycolide)s facilitate the preparation of small negatively charged biodegradable nanospheres", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000701), vol. 67, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(00)00201-7, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 157 - 169, XP004199165 [X] 1-7 * page 166, column l, line 4 - line 6; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(00)00201-7 | [XY] - TOBIAS JUNG ET AL, PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (20020101), vol. 19, no. 8, doi:10.1023/A:1019833822997, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1105 - 1113, XP055215374 [X] 1-9,11,13-18 * page 1106, column l, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 1106, column r, paragraph l; figure 1 * [Y] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1019833822997 | [XY] - DEMENTO S L ET AL, "Inflammasome-activating nanoparticles as modular systems for optimizing vaccine efficacy", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 27, no. 23, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2009.03.034, ISSN 0264-410X, (20090518), pages 3013 - 3021, (20090403), XP026058717 [X] 1-11,13-18 * figure 5 * [Y] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.03.034 | [XY] - HU CHE-MING J ET AL, "Erythrocyte membrane-camouflaged polymeric nanoparticles as a biomimetic delivery platform", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20110705), vol. 108, no. 27, doi:10.1073/PNAS.1106634108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10980 - 10985, XP002738629 [X] 1-11,13-18 * figure 1 * [Y] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.1106634108 | [Y] - O'HAGAN D T ET AL, "Microparticle-based technologies for vaccines", METHODS, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 40, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.YMETH.2006.05.017, ISSN 1046-2023, (20060901), pages 10 - 19, (20060901), XP024908467 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2006.05.017 | [Y] - MUTSUMI YOSHIDA ET AL, "Poly(lactic-co-glycolic acid) enhances maturation of human monocyte-derived dendritic cells", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, (20041001), vol. 71A, no. 1, doi:10.1002/jbm.a.30131, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 45 - 54, XP055215284 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.a.30131 | [Y] - SINGH M ET AL, "Cationic microparticles are an effective delivery system for immunie stimulatory CpG DNA", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, SPRINGER NEW YORK LLC, US, (20011001), vol. 18, no. 10, doi:10.1023/A:1012269226066, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1476 - 1479, XP002976979 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012269226066 | [Y] - SINGH MANMOHAN ET AL, "Anionic microparticles are a potent delivery system for recombinant antigens from Neisseria meningitidis serotype B", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (20040201), vol. 93, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 273 - 282, XP002632951 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - KAZZAZ J ET AL, "Novel anionic microparticles are a potent adjuvant for the induction of cytotoxic T lymphocytes against recombinant p55 gag from HIV-1", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000701), vol. 67, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(00)00226-1, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 347 - 356, XP004199181 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(00)00226-1 | [Y] - MAURICIO A. ARIAS ET AL, "Glucopyranosyl Lipid Adjuvant (GLA), a Synthetic TLR4 Agonist, Promotes Potent Systemic and Mucosal Responses to Intranasal Immunization with HIVgp140", PLOS ONE, (20120101), vol. 7, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0041144, ISSN 1932-6203, page e41144, XP055047355 [Y] 12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0041144 | Examination | WO2009128950 |