EP3111582 - USER EQUIPMENT AND EVOLVED NODE-B AND METHODS FOR RANDOM ACCESS FOR MACHINE TYPE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Seunghee 10129 S Blaney Avenue E Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
XIONG, Gang 16682 NW Arizona Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Goddar, Heinz J. BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15751636.0 | 24.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015US17235 | Priority number, date | US201461943979P | 24.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461943979 P | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015127424 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111582 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04L5/00 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (KR);
H04W4/70 (US);
H04W74/0838 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | H04L5/00, H04W4/00, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2017/01] | H04L5/00, H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT UND EVOLVED NODE-B UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIREKTZUGRIFF FÜR MASCHINENARTIGE KOMMUNIKATION | [2017/01] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT AND EVOLVED NODE-B AND METHODS FOR RANDOM ACCESS FOR MACHINE TYPE COMMUNICATION | [2017/01] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET NOEUD B ÉVOLUÉ ET PROCÉDÉS D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE POUR COMMUNICATION DE TYPE MACHINE | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 22.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2013039309 (CHIU CHUN-YUAN [TW]); |