EP3110304 - GASTROINTESTINAL ENDOSCOPY WITH ATTACHABLE INTESTINE PLEATING STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visualization Balloons, LLC 8 Woodland Road West Caldwell, New Jersey 07006 / US | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYDEL, Boris 8 Woodland Road West Caldwell, New Jersey 07006 / US | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Bingham, Ian Mark The IP Asset Partnership Limited Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov The IP Asset Partnership Limited Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15752011.5 | 20.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015US16901 | Priority number, date | US201461966403P | 24.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461966403 P | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015127265 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3110304 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
A61B1/00082 (EP,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP,US);
A61B1/00101 (EP);
A61B1/00131 (US);
A61B1/00135 (EP,US);
A61B1/00137 (EP);
A61B1/0014 (EP,US);
A61B1/00148 (EP);
G02B23/24 (US);
G02B23/2476 (EP,US);
A61B1/05 (US);
A61B1/31 (US);
A61M25/0067 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | GASTROINTESTINALE ENDOSKOPIE MIT ANFÜGBAREN DARMFALTUNGSSTRUKTUREN | [2017/01] | English: | GASTROINTESTINAL ENDOSCOPY WITH ATTACHABLE INTESTINE PLEATING STRUCTURES | [2017/01] | French: | ENDOSCOPIE GASTRO-INTESTINALE À L'AIDE DE STRUCTURES DE PLISSAGE DE L'INTESTIN POUVANT ÊTRE FIXÉES | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 07.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/16] | 13.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   09.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2003033319 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]US2004077926 (MORIYAMA HIROKI [JP]); | [Y]US2012259175 (REYDEL BORIS [US], et al); | [XY]EP2575590 (ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LTD [GB]); | [E]EP3079558 (VISUALIZATION BALLOONS LLC [US]) | International search | [XYA]US2004077926 (MORIYAMA HIROKI [JP]); | [YA]US2012259157 (SPENCE PAUL A [US]); | [XYA]US2013090527 (AXON ANTHONY [GB]) | by applicant | WO2011148172 |