EP3109130 - TROLLEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chigoo Interactive Technology Co., Ltd. 3rd Floor, B1 Building, Airport Industrial Park and Technology Business Center No. 35 Changjiang South Road Xinwu District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Tao 3rd Floor, B1 Building Airport Industrial Park and Technology Business Center No. 35 Changjang South Road, Xinwu District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 02 /
PAN, Chuanrong 3rd Floor, B1 Building Airport Industrial Park and Technology Business Center No. 35 Changjang South Road, Xinwu District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Rong 3rd Floor, B1 Building Airport Industrial Park and Technology Business Center No. 35 Changjang South Road, Xinwu District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214028 / CN | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP - MC/EP 17, avenue Albert II C/º The Office & Co - L'ALBU 98000 Monaco / MC | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Hautier IP 1, Rue du Gabian Le Thalès - 12 Etg - Bloc A 98000 Monaco / MC | Application number, filing date | 15752199.8 | 15.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015CN73108 | Priority number, date | CN20142068906U | 18.02.2014 Original published format: CN 201420068906 U | [2016/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124097 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109130 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/14 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
B62B3/1416 (EP,KR,US);
B62B3/1424 (EP,KR,US);
B62B3/027 (US);
B62B3/1428 (EP,KR,US);
B62B3/1472 (US);
B62B3/1492 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | B62B5/06, B62B3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | WAGEN | [2016/52] | English: | TROLLEY | [2016/52] | French: | CHARIOT | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2016 | Translation filed | 14.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/46] | 09.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006117627 (SPRINGBOARD RETAIL NETWORKS LICENSING SRL [BB], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 45]; figure 26 * [I] 5,6; | [XI]US2013249202 (WHITE BRYAN T [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0029]; figures 3-7 * [I] 5; | [XI]US2006266904 (CRUM BRYAN [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 35] , [0 36]; figures 1, 2, 20 * [I] 4,5,8; | [I]JP2012218502 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 25] , [0 26]; figures 2, 3, 6, 7, 13-15 * | International search | [PX]CN201231764Y (ZHUHAI XINSHI ELECTRON SCIENCE [CN]) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE3717901 (WANZL KG RUDOLF [DE]) [X] 1, 2, 5 * description, column 1, line 48 to column 2, line 28, and figure 1 description, column 1, line 48 to column 2, line 28, and figure 1 * [Y] 3-8; | [Y]US2006266904 (CRUM BRYAN [US]) [Y] 3-8 * description, paragraphs [0034] and [0036], figure 1 *; | [A]EP1582432 (MAHE GERARD [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]CN203713943U (CHIGOO INTERACTIVE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |