EP3191923 - TOUCH SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TouchNetix Limited 4 Manor Court Barnes Wallis Road Fareham Hampshire PO15 5TH / GB | [2023/24] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Touchnetix Limited Forum 3 Parkway Solent Business Park Whiteley Fareham, Hampshire PO15 7FH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Stephen William c/o TouchNetix Limited 4 Manor Court Barnes Walis Road Fareham Hampshire PO15 5TH / GB | [2023/25] |
Former [2017/29] | 01 /
ROBERTS, Stephen William c/o TouchNetix Limited 4 Manor Court Barnes Walis Road Whiteley Fareham Hampshire PO15 5FH / GB | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15753146.8 | 13.08.2015 | [2017/29] | WO2015GB52337 | Priority number, date | GB20140015829 | 08.09.2014 Original published format: GB 201415829 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016038329 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3191923 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3191923 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
G06F3/0443 (EP,US);
G06F3/044 (GB);
G06F3/0448 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04112 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/29] | G06F3/044 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSSENSOREN | [2017/29] | English: | TOUCH SENSORS | [2017/29] | French: | CAPTEURS TACTILES | [2017/29] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 23.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | IE | 13.08.2023 | LU | 13.08.2023 | FR | 21.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | GB | 21.09.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
IE | 13.08.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
FR | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
GB | 21.09.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
IE | 13.08.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
GB | 21.09.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
LU | 13.08.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11110115 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-19* paragraph [0009] *; | [IA]JP3175346B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [I] 1,4-7,14,15,19 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figures 8,9 * [A] 2,3,8-13,16-18; | [A]WO2013039050 (GUNZE KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [I]US2013127744 (SHAKYA JYOTINDRA RAJ [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0104]; figure 12 *; | [A]US2013194232 (IMAMURA TAKUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104]; figures 1,8,52 *; | [A]US2014225839 (DUNPHY JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0084]; figure - *; | [AP]US2014360856 (MIZUMOTO HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [AP] 1-19 * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068]; figure - * | Examination | US2013100041 | WO2014115832 | US2015331538 |