EP3183236 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 18F-LABELED ACTIVE ESTERS AND THEIR APPLICATION EXEMPLIFIED BY THE PREPARATION OF A PSMA-SPECIFIC PET-TRACER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 Munich / DE | For all designated states Universität zu Köln Albertus-Magnus-Platz 50923 Köln / DE | [2018/12] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 Munich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMAIER, Bernd Josef-Löcher-Str. 25 50354 Hürth / DE | 02 /
ZLATOPOLSKIY, Boris Andreaestr. 29 51063 Köln / DE | 03 /
RICHARZ, Raphael Alte Garten 29 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
KRAPF, Phillip Dörrenbitze 12 53804 Much / DE | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Kilger, Ute Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2017/26] | Kilger, Ute Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15753692.1 | 24.08.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015EP69356 | Priority number, date | EP20140182053 | 24.08.2014 Original published format: EP 14182053 | EP20140183635 | 04.09.2014 Original published format: EP 14183635 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016030329 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183236 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3183236 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/81, C07D213/82, C07C275/16, C07D231/14, C07D241/24, C07C231/02, A61K31/44, A61P35/00 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07B59/002 (US);
C07C275/16 (EP,US);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D237/24 (EP,US);
C07D241/24 (EP,US);
C07K1/13 (EP,US);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
C07B2200/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | 20.03.2017 | ME | 20.03.2017 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 18F-MARKIERTEN AKTIVEN ESTERN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG AM BEISPIEL DER HERSTELLUNG EINES PSMA-SPEZIFISCHEN PET-TRACERS | [2017/26] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 18F-LABELED ACTIVE ESTERS AND THEIR APPLICATION EXEMPLIFIED BY THE PREPARATION OF A PSMA-SPECIFIC PET-TRACER | [2017/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ESTERS ACTIFS MARQUÉS AU 18F ET LEUR APPLICATION ILLUSTRÉE PAR LA PRÉPARATION D'UN TRACEUR POUR PET SPÉCIFIQUE DE L'ANTIGÈNE MEMBRANAIRE SPÉCIFIQUE DE LA PROSTATE (PSMA) | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 20.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.05.2020 | 04.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2015 | AL | 20.04.2022 | AT | 20.04.2022 | CY | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | TR | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | IE | 24.08.2022 | LU | 24.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 24.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 24.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.08.2015 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 24.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
LU | 24.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008058192 (MOLECULAR INSIGHT PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 11-15 * claims 1, 11 * [I] 31,32; | [I]WO2009002529 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [I] 1-15,31,32 * claim 4 * * product after step ii, step iii; pages 35-36 *; | [Y]WO2009003251 (TRASIS S A [BE], et al) [Y] 16* page 6, paragraph 24 *; | [XI]WO2010014933 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [X] 1-15,32 * claims 16, 18, 21-23 * * page 20, paragraphs 66, 67 * [I] 31; | [XYI]WO2010108125 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [X] 1-15,17 * claim 1 * * page 74; compounds YC-VIII-24 * * page 79; compounds Lys-Urea-Glu * [Y] 18-30 [I] 31,32; | [XY] - HASSAN M. SHALLAL ET AL, "Heterobivalent Agents Targeting PSMA and Integrin-[alpha] v [beta] 3", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20140219), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1021/bc4005377, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 393 - 405, XP055214872 [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15,17 * page 397; compound 2 * * scheme 1 * [Y] 18-30 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc4005377 | [XYI] - R. RICHARZ ET AL, "Neither azeotropic drying, nor base nor other additives: a minimalist approach to 18 F-labeling", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, GB, (20140101), vol. 12, no. 40, doi:10.1039/C4OB01336K, ISSN 1477-0520, pages 8094 - 8099, XP055229136 [X] 31 * footnotes;; tables 2, 4 * * scheme 1 * [Y] 16 [I] 16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4OB01336K | Examination | WO2010114723 | - NOEEN MALIK ET AL, "Radiosynthesis of a new PSMA targeting ligand ([F]FPy-DUPA-Pep)", APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 69, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.APRADISO.2011.03.041, ISSN 0969-8043, (20110329), pages 1014 - 1018, (20110408), XP028384396 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apradiso.2011.03.041 | - KIM SERDONS ET AL, "The Prescence of Ethanol in Radiopharmaceutical Injections", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, (20080101), vol. 49, doi:10.2967/jnumed.108.057026, page 2071, XP055481242 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.108.057026 |