EP3169178 - ITEM OF FOOTWEAR OF IMPROVED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A.S. 14 Chemin des Croiselets ZA des Croiselets 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUCHER, Béatrice Curnillex F-74270 Chilly / FR | 02 /
GAUTIER, Gérard Chemin du Bonbernard 6 F-1169 Yens / FR | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 15754256.4 | 07.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015FR00136 | Priority number, date | FR20140001631 | 18.07.2014 Original published format: FR 1401631 | [2017/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016009115 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169178 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/04, A43B23/02, A43B19/00, A43B23/08, A43B23/16 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
A43B19/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B23/042 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B23/024 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B23/027 (US);
A43B23/0215 (US);
A43B23/0235 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B23/0275 (US);
A43B23/07 (US);
A43B23/081 (KR);
A43B23/086 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43B23/087 (US);
A43B23/088 (KR);
A43B23/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A43C1/06 (US);
A43D3/02 (US);
D04B1/126 (EP,US);
D04B1/24 (EP,US);
D10B2501/043 (EP,US);
Y02P70/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Title | German: | SCHUHWERK MIT VERBESSERTER STRUKTUR | [2017/21] | English: | ITEM OF FOOTWEAR OF IMPROVED STRUCTURE | [2017/21] | French: | ARTICLE CHAUSSANT À STRUCTURE AMÉLIORÉE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 21.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]FR2999882 (SALOMON SAS [FR]) [X] 1-3,7-12,15,17-21 * page 6, lines 4,5; figures 6a, 6b; claim 1 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 13,14,16; | [XA]EP1040768 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0046] * [A] 4; | [X]US2001020341 (RORK THOMAS F [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * figures 6-7; claim - *; | [YD]FR2999881 (SALOMON SAS [FR]) [YD] 13,14,16 * figure -; claim - * | Examination | WO2016012665 | by applicant | FR2999881 |