EP3113575 - HEATER AND GLOWPLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIURA, Norimitsu c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2019/51] |
Former [2017/01] | 01 /
HIURA, Norimitsu c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/01] | Application number, filing date | 15754614.4 | 25.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015JP55334 | Priority number, date | JP20140035719 | 26.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014035719 | [2017/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015129722 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113575 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3113575 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/02, F23Q7/00, H05B3/48, H05B3/06 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
H05B3/48 (EP);
F23Q7/001 (EP);
H05B3/06 (EP);
H05B2203/027 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/01] | H05B3/02, F23Q7/00, H05B3/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZELEMENT UND GLÜHKERZE | [2017/01] | English: | HEATER AND GLOWPLUG | [2017/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE ET BOUGIE DE PRÉCHAUFFAGE | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2016 | Translation filed | 01.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 01.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2015 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | ES | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | IT | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | IE | 25.02.2020 | LU | 25.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.02.2015 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2020 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPS60114630 (JIDOSHA KIKI CO, et al) [I] 1,2,5 * figure 4 *; | [I]JPS6176824 (JIDOSHA KIKI CO) [I] 1,2,5 * figure 1 *; | [I]JPS62175523 (JIDOSHA KIKI CO, et al) [I] 1,2,5 * figure 3 *; | [Y]JPH0443721Y (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 3,4* figure 3 *; | [XY]JP2002257341 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1b,1c,2 * [Y] 3,4 | International search | [A]JPS6391432 (JIDOSHA KIKI CO) [A] 1-5 * , page 4, upper left column, line 18 to lower left column, line 7; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6380456U (NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-5 * , page 2, line 11 to page 4, line 6; fig. 2, 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH0443721Y (Kyocera Corp.) [Y] 1-5 * , column 3, line 15 to column 4, line 25; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005315447 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-5* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2009096477 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0016], [0031], [0037], [0046]; fig. 1, 10 to 12 & JP 5166451 B & US 2011/0068091 A1 & EP 2247156 A1 & KR 10-2010-0106589 A & CN 101933392 A * |