EP3111850 - ULTRASONIC IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Tomohiko c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Takashi c/o HITACHI ALOKA MEDICAL, LTD. 6-22-1 Mure Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-8622 / JP | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/01] | Application number, filing date | 15754706.8 | 19.01.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015JP51281 | Priority number, date | JP20140038538 | 28.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014038538 | [2017/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015129336 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111850 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/06, A61B8/14 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/0883 (EP,US);
A61B8/14 (US);
A61B8/463 (US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
A61B8/488 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLBILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2017/01] | English: | ULTRASONIC IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE AND METHOD | [2017/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE ULTRASONORE | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2016 | Translation filed | 28.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 18.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/12] | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012041318 (TAYLOR CHARLES A [US]) [Y] 10,15* paragraph [0339] *; | [XYI]WO2013157553 (HITACHI ALOKA MEDICAL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 10,15 [I] 4,5,7-9,13,14; | US2015094582 [ ] (TANAKA TOMOHIKO [JP], et al) [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2008080106 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2008/0051661 A1 & JP 5231768 B2 *; | [A]JP2013176492 (HITACHI ALOKA MEDICAL LTD) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013157553 (HITACHI ALOKA MEDICAL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * , entire text; all drawings & CN 104220005 A *; | [A] - TAKASHI OKADA et al., "4. Ketsuryu no Sokudo Vector Hyoji Vector Flow Mapping(VFM", INNERVISION, (20140225), vol. 29, no. 3, page 70, XP008184609 [A] 1-16 |