EP3113435 - MODULATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIGNAL TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Sungnam 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
SAGONG, Min 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
LIM, Chiwoo 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2017/01] | Application number, filing date | 15755266.2 | 13.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015KR01463 | Priority number, date | KR20140023620 | 27.02.2014 Original published format: KR 20140023620 | [2017/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015130043 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113435 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3113435 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/34, H04L27/10, H04L25/03, H04B17/336 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H04L27/3411 (EP,US);
H04B17/336 (US);
H04L1/0006 (US);
H04L1/0007 (EP);
H04L1/0026 (EP);
H04L25/03866 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/01] | H04L27/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG UND -EMPFANG IN MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/01] | English: | MODULATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIGNAL TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MODULATION PERMETTANT UNE ÉMISSION ET UNE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2016 | Translation filed | 29.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 29.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2015 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | ES | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | IT | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | IE | 13.02.2022 | LU | 13.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | FR | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 13.02.2015 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.02.2015 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 13.02.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
FR | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005025221 (LINDSEY WILLIAM C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,13 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0074]; figure 6 * [Y] 3,10 [I] 4,7,11,12,14,15; | [YA]US2004141481 (LEE KYESAN [JP], et al) [Y] 3,10 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0032] * [A] 1,2,4-9,11-15 | International search | [XY]US2011134747 (KWON YEONG HYEON [KR], et al) [X] 1-3, 6, 9-11, 13, 14 * See paragraphs [0053], [0066]-[0068], [0076], [0087]; claim 1; and figures 4, 9. * [Y] 4, 5, 7, 8, 12, 15, 16; | [Y]US2011019697 (SEKI YUTA [JP], et al) [Y] 4, 5, 7, 8, 12, 15, 16 * See paragraphs [0067]-[0094]; and figures 9-14. *; | [A]US2012093248 (KWON YEONG HYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0060]-[0076]; and figures 2-4. *; | [A]WO2010004586 (CT OF EXCELLENCE IN WIRELESS T [IN], et al) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0033]; and figures 1-6. *; | [A]EP1995904 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0039]; and figures 4-7. * |