EP3112090 - ELECTRIC TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 15-1, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6020 / JP | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Yuuki c/o Hitachi koki Co. Ltd. 1060 Takeda Hitachinaka-city Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15756063.2 | 23.01.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015JP51864 | Priority number, date | JP20140039636 | 28.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014039636 | [2017/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015129359 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3112090 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02, B24B23/02, B24B55/05 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,US);
B24B23/028 (EP,US);
B24B55/052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES WERKZEUG | [2017/01] | English: | ELECTRIC TOOL | [2017/01] | French: | OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2016 | Translation filed | 16.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 16.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2014000344 (SHANGHAI KEN TOOLS CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 6 [I] 3; | [XI]EP1741521 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,5,6,8,9 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-2 * [I] 3; | [X]EP2524765 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-13 * | International search | [A]DE102008044403 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & CN 101745840 A *; | [A]WO2009059838 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & DE 102007052685 A1 *; | [A]US5637035 (YEE CHUNGKIN [US]) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & GB 2302717 A & DE 19618954 A1 *; | [A]JPS61127966U (Mitsubishi Electric Corp.) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US2010178857 (ESENWEIN FLORIAN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2009/059839 A1 & DE 102007052864 A1 & CN 101848790 A * |