EP3183488 - INTERNAL SEALING SLEEVE WITH RETAINING ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR EXPANDING AN INTERNAL SEALING SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/26] | SEAL INTERNAL SLEEVE WITH RETAINING ELEMENT | ||
[2018/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAF Patentverwertungs GbR Hauptstraße 24 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAF, Jürgen Hauptstr. 24 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | 02 /
GRAF, Joachim Hauptstr. 24 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 15756869.2 | 18.08.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015EP68937 | Priority number, date | DE201410111916 | 20.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014111916 | [2017/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016026851 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183488 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3183488 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/163 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
F16L55/163 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSINNENMANSCHETTE MIT HALTEELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFWEITEN EINER DICHTUNGSINNENMANSCHETTE | [2018/17] | English: | INTERNAL SEALING SLEEVE WITH RETAINING ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR EXPANDING AN INTERNAL SEALING SLEEVE | [2018/17] | French: | MANCHON D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ INTÉRIEUR MUNI D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉVASER UN MANCHON D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ INTÉRIEUR | [2018/17] |
Former [2017/26] | DICHTUNGSINNENMANSCHETTE MIT HALTEELEMENT | ||
Former [2017/26] | SEAL INTERNAL SLEEVE WITH RETAINING ELEMENT | ||
Former [2017/26] | MANCHON D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ INTÉRIEUR MUNI D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 02.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2015 | AL | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.08.2015 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.08.2015 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NO | 03.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US3960395 (CIRULE FRED M, et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 42; figures 6-12 * [A] 11-13 [I] 3; | [XAI]DE3507393 (EBERLE J N FEDERNFAB [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * pages 5-7 * [A] 11-13 [I] 3; | [AD]DE4401318 (UHRIG KANALTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * abstract *; | [AD]DE19544877 (UHRIG KANALTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * abstract *; | [XAI]DE19910522 (LEWIN HANS GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 4 * * column 10, lines 20-59 * [A] 11-13 [I] 3; | [XAI]DE202010013588U (UHRIG KANALTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] * [A] 11-13 [I] 3; | [AD]DE102012111341 (GRAF PATENTVERWERTUNGS GBR VERTRETUNGSBERECHTIGTE GESELLSCHAFTER JUERGEN GRAF [DE]) [AD] 1-13* abstract * |