EP3183909 - INTER/INTRA RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGY MOBILITY AND USER-PLANE SPLIT MEASUREMENT CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORN, Gavin Bernard 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
TENNY, Nathan Edward 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 15757050.8 | 12.08.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015US44786 | Priority number, date | US201462039216P | 19.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462039216 P | US201514599088 | 16.01.2015 Original published format: US201514599088 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016028562 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183909 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/28, H04W36/16, H04W36/38 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
H04W40/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W24/10 (KR,US);
H04W28/10 (KR,US);
H04W36/00695 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/385 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/00692 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/00698 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/165 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W36/30 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W36/305 (EP,CN,US);
H04W88/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Title | German: | KONFIGURATION VON MOBILITÄT UND GETEILTER MESSUNG AUF BENUTZEREBENE EINER INTER-/INTRAFUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIE | [2017/26] | English: | INTER/INTRA RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGY MOBILITY AND USER-PLANE SPLIT MEASUREMENT CONFIGURATION | [2017/26] | French: | MOBILITÉ INTER/INTRA-TECHNOLOGIE D'ACCÈS RADIO ET CONFIGURATION DE MESURE À DIVISION DU PLAN UTILISATEUR | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 05.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2011100492 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al); | [XI]WO2012139016 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al); | [XI]US2014010207 (HORN GAVIN BERNARD [US], et al); | [XI]US2014079022 (WANG GUANZHOU [CA], et al); | [XI]WO2014056130 (BROADCOM CORP [US], et al) |