EP3188965 - CONTROLLABLE PITCH PROPELLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Piening Schiffspropeller Und Wellenanlagen GmbH Am Altendeich 83 25348 Glückstadt / DE | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEIN, Mathias Kieler Strasse 634 22527 Hamburg / DE | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3 C 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Lins, Martina Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 15757285.0 | 02.09.2015 | [2019/24] | WO2015EP70074 | Priority number, date | DE20141012766 | 02.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014012766 | [2019/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016034639 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3188965 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3188965 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B63H3/08, F15B21/06 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
B63H3/08 (EP);
B63H2003/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Title | German: | VERSTELLPROPELLER | [2019/24] | English: | CONTROLLABLE PITCH PROPELLER | [2018/29] | French: | HELICE À PAS VARIABLE | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2020
20.03.2020
ADMISSIBLE Schaffran Propeller + Service GmbH Bei der Gasanstalt 6-8 23560 Lübeck / DE Opponent's representative Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2020/18] | 27.03.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.08.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.05.2024 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 25.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T0547/22 | 25.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 02.05.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.05.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 01.03.2022 | Appeal received No. T0547/22 | 01.03.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 26.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.05.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.05.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2015 | AL | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | IE | 02.09.2019 | LU | 02.09.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | GB | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | AT | 02.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/07] | HU | 02.09.2015 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 02.09.2019 | ||
LU | 02.09.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 02.09.2015 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 02.09.2019 | ||
LU | 02.09.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.09.2015 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 02.09.2019 | ||
LU | 02.09.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 02.09.2019 | ||
LU | 02.09.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 02.09.2019 | ||
LU | 02.09.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GB | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 02.09.2019 | ||
LU | 02.09.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 02.09.2019 | ||
LU | 02.09.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 02.09.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 12.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1902941 (AIR FERTIGUNG TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024]; figure - * [I] 3,6; | [A] - Alan Hitchcox, "Water Hydraulics: Benefits and Limitations", Hydraulics & Pneumatics, (20120101), URL: http://hydraulicspneumatics.com/200/TechZone/HydraulicFluids/Article/False/6452/TechZone-HydraulicFluids, (20160108), XP055239566 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | Opposition | DE666385 | US3412808 | US3778187 | GB2140096 | EP1902941 |