EP3115843 - PROJECTOR AND PROJECTOR CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUYAMA, Takanori c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
NARA, Hiroshi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
MAETA, Kazunori c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 04 /
NAGATANI, Kaname c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2017/27] |
Former [2017/02] | 01 /
FUKUYAMA, Takanori c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
NARA, Hiroshi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
MAETA, Kazunori c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | |||
04 /
NAGATANI, Kaname c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [2017/02] | Application number, filing date | 15758086.1 | 27.02.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015JP01032 | Priority number, date | JP20140040476 | 03.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014040476 | [2017/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015133104 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3115843 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/14, H04N9/31 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
H04N9/3194 (EP,US);
G03B21/145 (EP,US);
G03B21/20 (EP,US);
G03B21/2053 (US);
G03B21/2066 (US);
H04N9/3144 (EP,US);
H04N9/3164 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | G03B21/14, G03B21/00, H04N5/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Title | German: | PROJEKTOR UND PROJEKTORSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/02] | English: | PROJECTOR AND PROJECTOR CONTROL METHOD | [2017/02] | French: | PROJECTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PROJECTEUR | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2016 | Translation filed | 04.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 15.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 19.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2551719 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 3-7 * [Y] 4,7; | [XY]JP2008122887 (ZERO RABO KK) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 20] , [0 21] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 7; | [Y]JP2009151064 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * figure 2 * | International search | [A]JP2009151064 (Seiko Epson Corp.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008185712 (Seiko Epson Corp.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011203590 (Panasonic Corp.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012003257 (Panasonic Corp.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0292649 A1 *; | [A]JP2011007834 (Seiko Epson Corp.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011075972 (Seiko Epson Corp.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011253156 (Hitachi Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0299046 A1 & CN 102269919 A * |