EP3116050 - GAS-PERMEABLE MEMBER AND BREATHABLE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Kyouko c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
YANO, Yozou c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
FURUUCHI, Kouji c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
FUKUOKA, Takahiro c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 05 /
KIRA, Yoshiko c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/02] | Application number, filing date | 15758406.1 | 06.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015JP56720 | Priority number, date | JP20140044318 | 06.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014044318 | [2017/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015133624 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3116050 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/12, B01D53/22, B01D63/08, H01G2/14, H01G9/12, H01G11/18, H01G11/78, H01M2/04, H01G9/08 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H01G9/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/394 (EP,KR,US);
H01G11/78 (EP,KR,US);
H01G9/08 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/13 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | H01M2/12, B01D53/22, B01D63/08, H01G2/14, H01G9/12, H01G11/18, H01G11/78, H01M2/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Title | German: | GASDURCHLÄSSIGES ELEMENT UND ATMUNGSAKTIVER BEHÄLTER | [2017/02] | English: | GAS-PERMEABLE MEMBER AND BREATHABLE CONTAINER | [2017/02] | French: | ÉLÉMENT PERMÉABLE AUX GAZ ET CONTENANT PERMÉABLE À L'AIR | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2016 | Translation filed | 15.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 23.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1939523 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0037] * [I] 3; | [X]US5891223 (SHAW MARK D [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, lines 4-18 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 6; figure 2 * | International search | [X]JP2012230983 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-4 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2008237949 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0032] to [0033]; fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2008113037 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0024]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2003008247 (TDK CORP) [X] 1-4 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2002/0190485 A1 * |