EP3119795 - GEMCITABINE ANALOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUCORION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Willmington, DE 19808 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGGART, David, J. 243 N. Stanwood Road Columbus, OH 43209 / US | 02 /
CAO, Sheng 139 E. Fairmount Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53217 / US | 03 /
SUO, Zucai 8120 Holyrood Court Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15758660.3 | 27.02.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US18184 | Priority number, date | US201461947050P | 03.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461947050 P | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134334 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119795 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/06, C07H19/11, C07H19/10, A61K31/7068, A61P31/22, A61P31/20, A61P31/18, A61P31/14, A61P35/00, A61K45/06 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
C07H19/06 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07H19/10 (EP,US);
C07H19/11 (EP,US);
A61K31/706 (EP,US);
A61K31/7064 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | C07H19/11, C07H19/10, C07H19/06, A61K31/7068, A61P31/22, A61P31/20, A61P31/18, A61P31/14, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | GEMCITABIN-ANALOGA | [2017/04] | English: | GEMCITABINE ANALOGS | [2017/04] | French: | ANALOGUES DE GEMCITABINE | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 21.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 17.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2013142525 (ALIOS BIOPHARMA INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,6-8,14-18 * Claims, in particular claims 1-2, 86 and 155 and examples * [A] 5; | [YA]WO2012040126 (ALIOS BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6-8,14-18 * Claims, in particular claims 1, 52 and 64-83 and examples * [A] 5; | [A]WO2006065525 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-8,14-18 * Claims 1 and 6-10 *; | [YPA]WO2014074725 (OHIO STATE INNOVATION FOUNDATION [US]) [YP] 1,2,4,6-8,14-18 * Claims, in particular claims 1, 76 and 87; Examples * [A] 5; | [E]WO2015081133 (IDENIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [E] 1,2,4-8,14-18 * Claims, in particular claims 1, 3, 44-47; Examples * | [A] - WU WEIDONG ET AL, "Synthesis and biological activity of a gemcitabine phosphoramidate prodrug", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 50, no. 15, doi:10.1021/JM070269U, ISSN 0022-2623, (20070726), pages 3743 - 3746, (20070629), XP002474645 [A] 1,2,4-8,14-18 * Whole document, in particular compound 6 in scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm070269u | [YA] - CUIRONG ZHAO ET AL, "Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of Oral Prodrugs Based on the Structure of Gemcitabine", CHEMICAL BIOLOGY & DRUG DESIGN., GB, (20120925), vol. 80, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1747-0285.2012.01422.x, ISSN 1747-0277, pages 479 - 488, XP055289724 [Y] 1,2,4,6-8,14-18 * Whole document, in particular Figure 1 and compound 5a in Table 1 * [A] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1747-0285.2012.01422.x | International search | [A]WO2013142525 (ALIOS BIOPHARMA INC [US]) [A] 1-48 * see Examples 24, 38 and 108 pages 141, 163 and 250; Formulas (I) and (II) paragraph [0084]; paragraph [0194] *; | [A]WO2012040126 (ALIOS BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * Examples 14, 44, 55, 68 and table 7 pages 154, 181, 192 and 218-231; Formula (I) paragraph [0087]; paragraphs [0149]-[0152] *; | [PX]WO2014145207 (OHIO STATE INNOVATION FOUNDATION [US]) [PX] 25, 26, 28b, 29a and 30-48 * see page 50 2nd row 1st compound, page 51 4th row 2nd compound, and page 53 2nd row 2nd compound; paragraph [00220], [00225] and [00232]; paragraphs [00262]; paragraphs [00239]-[00253] and [00296]-[00297] * |