EP3224164 - METHOD FOR COMBINING MATERIALS TO BE PACKAGED, AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING MATERIALS TO BE PACKAGED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Körber Supply Chain Logistics GmbH Lilienthalstraße 16/18 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2023/26] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states Körber Supply Chain Logistics GmbH Lilienthalstraße 16/18 78467 Konstanz / DE | ||
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEHLER, Rolf Unterhausgasse 4 78476 Allensbach / DE | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/40] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15760128.7 | 31.08.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015EP69859 | Priority number, date | DE201410224147 | 26.11.2014 Original published format: DE102014224147 | [2017/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016082950 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224164 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3224164 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/68 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
B65G47/681 (EP,CN,US);
B65G47/715 (US);
B65G47/683 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PACKGUTZUSAMMENFÜHRUNG UND PACKGUTFÖRDERVORRICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | METHOD FOR COMBINING MATERIALS TO BE PACKAGED, AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING MATERIALS TO BE PACKAGED | [2017/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉUNIR DES PRODUITS À EMBALLER ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE PRODUITS À EMBALLER | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 24.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | LU | 31.08.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
LU | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE468468 (LAUBE MASCHF, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * page 2, column 1, line 19 - page 2, column 1, line 43; figures 1-2 * [Y] 8,15 [I] 4,6; | [Y]US3536180 (DUBUS GERARD) [Y] 8,15 * the whole document *; | [XAYI]DE3340088 (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 14 [Y] 12 [I] 4,6,11,13; | [YA]EP0495261 (VANDERLANDE IND NEDERLAND [NL]) [Y] 12 * figures 1, 7 * [A] 14; | [A]WO9817556 (VCS CONTROL SYSTEMS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2004050518 (CALJAN LOADING SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007129843 (LUPTON CLINTON R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2048096 (MULAG FAHRZEUG WOESSNER [DE]) [A] 4* the whole document * | Examination | US4039074 |