EP3160152 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA USING HDMI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyeonjae LG Electronics Inc. R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Dokyun LG Electronics Inc. R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Jangwoong LG Electronics Inc. R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 04 /
YANG, Hyunsik LG Electronics Inc. R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15762031.1 | 11.03.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015KR02342 | Priority number, date | US201461952109P | 12.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461952109 P | [2017/03] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015137716 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3160152 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/43, H04N21/434, H04N21/41, G02B27/01, H04N21/4363, H04N21/435, H04N21/439, H04N21/4425, H04N21/472, H04N21/61, H04N21/81, H04N21/84, H04L1/00 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
H04N21/43635 (EP,KR,US);
G09G5/006 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (US);
H04N21/41 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/43 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/434 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4341 (US);
H04N21/435 (US);
H04N21/439 (US);
H04N21/4394 (US);
H04N21/4425 (US);
H04N21/472 (US);
H04N21/615 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/8126 (US);
H04N21/84 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/03] | H04N21/43, H04N21/434, H04N21/41, G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON DATEN MIT HDMI | [2017/03] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA USING HDMI | [2017/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSMETTRE ET RECEVOIR DES DONNÉES EN UTILISANT HDMI. | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2016 | Translation filed | 27.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 27.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009251605 (HSIAO CHIH-HAO [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - HDMI Forum, "High-Definition Multimedia Interface Specification Version 2.0", (20130904), URL: hdmiforum.org, (20170705), XP055388172 [Y] 1-15 * 6.2 Character Error Detection (p-45-47); 6.2.2 Error Counters and 10.4.1.8 (p. 120-121, for SCDC-CED mapping); page 45 - page 47 * * page 120 - page 121 * | International search | [A]KR20100104025 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0037]; claims 1-5; and figure 2. *; | [Y]KR20100137693 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 11,13,15,17 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0040]; claims 1-5, 13; and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20110085606 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-18* See paragraphs [0029]-[0036]; claims 6, 9-11; and figure 2. *; | [YA]US8253860 (HSIAO CHIH-HAO [TW]) [Y] 11,13,15,17 * See column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 48; claims 8-10, 17; and figure 3. * [A] 1-10,12,14,16,18; | [A]KR20140007698 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0085]-[0093]; claims 1, 4-8; and figure 13. * |