EP3115309 - CHEMICAL CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/02] | CHEMICAL LIQUID STORAGE BOTTLE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2018/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huaying Research Co., Ltd 1F Cetus Building Section A Wuxi (Nation) Software Park No. 18 Zhenze Road, Wuxi New District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214135 / CN | [2018/08] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states Wuxi Huaying Microelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. A-1 Floor Cetus Building No.18 Zhenze Road New district Wuxi, Jiangsu 214135 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEN, Sophia A-1 Floor Cetus Building No. 18 Zhenze Road New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214135 / CN | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2017/02] | Application number, filing date | 15762191.3 | 10.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015CN73931 | Priority number, date | CN20141092348 | 13.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410092348 | CN20141093750 | 13.03.2014 Original published format: CN201410093750 | [2017/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015135460 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3115309 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3115309 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/02, // B29L31/00, B29C65/00, B29C65/02 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
B65D11/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/0053 (US);
B65D1/00 (KR);
B65D11/22 (US);
B65D25/24 (KR);
B65D85/84 (KR);
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/543 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29L2031/712 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7154 (US);
B29L2031/7156 (US);
B65D1/16 (US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/16 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/18 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/05] | B65D8/02 | ||
Former IPC [2017/02] | B65D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG EINER CHEMISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/08] | English: | CHEMICAL CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2018/08] | French: | CONTENEUR POUR LIQUIDE CHIMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL CONTENEUR | [2018/08] |
Former [2017/02] | FLASCHE ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG EINER CHEMISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2017/02] | CHEMICAL LIQUID STORAGE BOTTLE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | ||
Former [2017/02] | BOUTEILLE DE STOCKAGE DE LIQUIDE CHIMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2016 | Translation filed | 06.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 06.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2015 | AL | 18.07.2018 | AT | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | DK | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | ES | 18.07.2018 | FI | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | IT | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | NL | 18.07.2018 | PL | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | RS | 18.07.2018 | SE | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | NO | 18.10.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | PT | 18.11.2018 | GB | 10.03.2019 | IE | 10.03.2019 | LU | 10.03.2019 | MT | 10.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 10.03.2015 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
GB | 10.03.2019 | ||
IE | 10.03.2019 | ||
LU | 10.03.2019 | ||
MT | 10.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
GB | 10.03.2019 | ||
IE | 10.03.2019 | ||
LU | 10.03.2019 | ||
MT | 10.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
GB | 10.03.2019 | ||
IE | 10.03.2019 | ||
LU | 10.03.2019 | ||
MT | 10.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
GB | 10.03.2019 | ||
IE | 10.03.2019 | ||
LU | 10.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
GB | 10.03.2019 | ||
IE | 10.03.2019 | ||
LU | 10.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 10.03.2019 | ||
LU | 10.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 10.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
IT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
AT | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 18.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2215192 (MANNESMANN MEER AG) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12,16,17 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 3-5,8-10,13-15,18,19; | [XI]EP0504718 (SCHUETZ WERKE GMBH CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * page 2, lines 34-52 * * figures 1-3, 9, 10, 15 * [I] 4,5,14,15; | [XI]JPH10129705 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,2,4,11,12,14 * abstract * [I] 3,5-10,13,15-19; | [X]JP2006283968 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,6,8-11,16,18,19* abstract * | International search | [A]CN1230702 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * , the whole document *; | [A]JP2005105294 (MITSUBISHI SHOJI PLAST KK, et al) [A] 1-19* , the whole document *; | [A]CN201330006Y (WEIDA WANG [CN]) [A] 1-19 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN102079409 (SEKISUI FORMING INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 1-19 * , description, paragraphs [0079]-[0104], and figures 1-17 *; | [A]CN102548868 (ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS) [A] 1-19 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN103879620 (WUXI HUAYING MICROELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-19 * , description, pages 4-6, and figures 1-9 *; | [PX]CN103964039 (WUXI HUAYING MICROELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-19 * , description, pages 3-7, and figures 1-9 *; | [PX]CN203767208U (WUXI HUAYING MICROELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-19 * , description, pages 3-6, and figures 1-9 *; | [PX]CN203767209U (WUXI HUAYING MICROELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-19 * , description, pages 3-6, and figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO2015004547 (CAPARTIS AG [CH]) [A] 1-19 * , the whole document * |