EP3118266 - FLUORINE-CONTAINING BORIC ACID COMPOSITE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unimatec Co., Ltd. 12-15, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0012 / JP | For all designated states Hirosaki University 1, Bunkyo-cho Hirosaki-shi, Aomori 036-8224 / JP | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUSHIMA, Takeshi c/o UNIMATEC CO. LTD. 831-2 Kamishoda Isoharamachi Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1544 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Katsuyuki c/o UNIMATEC CO. LTD. 831-2 Kamishoda Isoharamachi Kitaibaraki-shi Ibaraki 319-1544 / JP | 03 /
SAWADA, Hideo c/o HIROSAKI UNIVERSITY 1 Bunkyo-cho Hirosaki-shi Aomori 036-8224 / JP | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2017/03] | Application number, filing date | 15762346.3 | 10.03.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015JP57022 | Priority number, date | JP20140047313 | 11.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014047313 | [2017/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015137343 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3118266 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/12, C03C17/00 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
C03C17/009 (EP);
C09C3/08 (KR);
C09D5/1625 (US);
C01B35/06 (KR);
C03C17/328 (EP,US);
C08G77/58 (KR);
C08G79/00 (KR);
C09C1/00 (KR);
C09D4/06 (KR);
C09D5/1662 (US);
B82Y30/00 (KR);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/03] | C09D7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | FLUORINHALTIGE BORSÄUREVERBUNDSTOFFPARTIKEL | [2017/03] | English: | FLUORINE-CONTAINING BORIC ACID COMPOSITE PARTICLES | [2017/03] | French: | PARTICULES COMPOSITES D'ACIDE BORIQUE CONTENANT DU FLUOR | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2016 | Translation filed | 29.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 29.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05319868 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) [X] 1-5 * claim 1 * [I] 6-12 | [XI] - RACHEL M. LANIGAN ET AL, "Direct Synthesis of Amides from Carboxylic Acids and Amines Using B(OCH 2 CF 3 ) 3", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20130503), vol. 78, no. 9, doi:10.1021/jo400509n, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 4512 - 4523, XP055394847 [X] 1,2,5 * Introduction; page 4512 * * first paragraph; page 4513, column 1 * [I] 6-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo400509n | [XI] - MICHAEL A. BECKETT ET AL, "Lewis Acidity in Haloalkyl Orthoborate and Metaborate Esters", PHOSPHORUS, SULFUR AND SILICON AND THE RELATED ELEMENTS, US, (20010101), vol. 169, no. 1, doi:10.1080/10426500108546603, ISSN 1042-6507, pages 113 - 116, XP055394850 [X] 1,2,5 * Results and Discussion; page 114; compound 11 * [I] 6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10426500108546603 | International search | [A]JP2011063708 (UNIMATEC CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0178075 A1 & WO 2011/034003 A1 & EP 2479216 A1 & CN 102510880 A & KR 10-2012-0059508 A *; | [A]JP2003138213 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014501804 (3M Innovative Properties Co.) [A] 1-12 * , entire text & US 2013/0220177 A1 & WO 2012/064653 A1 & EP 2638117 A1 & CN 103201349 A *; | [A]JPH10104403 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [A] 1-12 * , entire text (Family: none) * |