EP3038414 - METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT FOR SELECTING NETWORK AND PERFORMING TRAFFIC ROUTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyunsook LG Electronics Inc. Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Jinsook LG Electronics Inc. Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Sunghoon LG Electronics Inc. Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Laeyoung LG Electronics Inc. Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Jaewook LG Electronics Inc. Seocho R&D Campus 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15762436.2 | 09.03.2015 | [2016/26] | WO2015KR02224 | Priority number, date | US201461952878P | 14.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461952878 P | US201461954583P | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954583 P | US201461992226P | 13.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461992226 P | [2016/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015137667 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3038414 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, H04W48/08, // H04W88/06 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W40/24 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/26] | H04W48/18, H04W48/08, H04W40/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL EINES NETZWERKES UND DURCHFÜHRUNG VON VERKEHRSLEITUNG | [2016/26] | English: | METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT FOR SELECTING NETWORK AND PERFORMING TRAFFIC ROUTING | [2016/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR POUR SÉLECTIONNER UN RÉSEAU ET EFFECTUER LE ROUTAGE DU TRAFIC | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2016 | Translation filed | 25.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 26.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2021 | 11.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/13] | 21.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 17.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "ANDSF traffic steering and Interaction of ANDSF and RAN rules", vol. RAN WG3, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140131), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-140713 WIFI WITH ANDSF_V0.6, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_85/Docs/, (20140131), XP050754298 [X] 1-14 * Sections 1, 2.1, 2.2.1, 2.2.2 and "Annex";; tables 1-4 * | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "When should eANDSF or RAN rules be used?", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-140643 WHEN SHOULD EANDSF OR RAN RULES BE USED, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140209), XP050791952 [X] 1,8 * Sections 1, 2.1, 2.2 and 2.4;; tables 2,3 * [I] 2-7,9-14 | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "RAN rule in roaming", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-140784 [WLAN] CONSIDERATION OF ROAMING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140209), XP050792070 [A] 1-14 * Section 2 * | International search | [XYA]KR20140022101 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC.) [X] 1, 3, 11 * See abstract; paragraphs [0002], [0025], [0037]-[0039]; claims 18-22; figures 3, 5. * [Y] 2, 5, 7, 8, 10, 12 [A] 4, 6, 9; | [Y]US2012309447 (MUSTAJARVI, Jari Pekka et al.) [Y] 2, 5, 7, 8, 10, 12 * See abstract; paragraphs [0019]-[0022], [0050]-[0064]; figures 2-6. *; | [A]WO2014015734 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMUNI CATIONS TECHNOLOGY et al.) [A] 1-12 * See abstract; page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 21; claims 1-5; figures 3-7. *; | [A]US8185152 (GOLDNER, Alla) [A] 1-12 * See abstract; column 15, line 31- column 17, line 36; figure 5 * |