EP3189365 - USER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM COMPRISING A CLEANING AND DISINFECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Winter & Ibe GmbH Kuehnstraße 61 22045 Hamburg / DE | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLSON, Torben Thiedeweg 29 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 15762929.6 | 20.08.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015EP69123 | Priority number, date | DE201410217559 | 03.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014217559 | [2017/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016034422 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189365 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3189365 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/70, G02B27/01, A61B90/96, A61B90/98 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61B1/123 (EP,US);
A61B1/00048 (EP,US);
A61B1/00059 (EP,US);
A61B90/361 (EP,US);
A61B90/70 (EP,US);
A61B90/96 (EP,US);
A61B90/98 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06F18/24 (US);
A61B2034/256 (EP,US);
A61B2090/502 (EP,US);
A61B2090/701 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZERASSISTENZSYSTEM EINER REINIGUNGS- UND DESINFEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2017/28] | English: | USER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM COMPRISING A CLEANING AND DISINFECTING DEVICE | [2017/28] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE À UN UTILISATEUR D'UN DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE ET DE DÉSINFECTION | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 22.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2022 | 29.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | ES | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | IE | 20.08.2023 | LU | 20.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
IE | 20.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
LU | 20.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 25.01.2023 | |
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002161460 (NOGUCHI TOSHIAKI [JP]) [Y] 2,12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014]; figures 11A-B * * paragraphs [0058] - [0064]; figures 7-8 *; | [XY]JP2009291308 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1,3,4,9-11,13,15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0025]; figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033]; figures 3A-B * * paragraphs [0047] - [0068]; figures 4-5 * [Y] 2,5-8,12,14; | [A]JP2013106790 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [A] 1-4,9-13,15 * paragraphs [0094] - [0103]; figures 12-13 *; | [Y]US2013278631 (BORDER JOHN N [US], et al) [Y] 5-8,14 * paragraphs [0284] - [0286]; figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0682] * * paragraphs [0730] - [0739] ** paragraphs [0747] - [0754] * |